Lenk v. Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Lenk
Defendant: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. and Maurice Sciammas
Case Number: 5:2016cv02625
Filed: May 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 71 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; GRANTING 47 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/8/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
February 7, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE AND FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 18, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 28 LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/18/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
December 7, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/7/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenk v. Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Lenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Sciammas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?