Estorga v. Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority

Plaintiff: Robert Estorga
Defendant: Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority
Case Number: 5:2016cv02668
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 34 MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/15/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 9, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 34 MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/9/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
September 12, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 11 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/12/2016.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estorga v. Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Estorga
Represented By: William James Flynn
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?