Farrell v. Boeing Employees Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Farrell
Defendant: Boeing Employees Credit Union and Moore Brewer & Wolfe
Case Number: 5:2016cv02711
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING FARRELL'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Re: Dkt. Nos. 77 , 78 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
February 2, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS ON FARRELL'S IIED CLAIM WITH PREJUDICE. Re: Dkt. No. 56 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
October 19, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Re: Dkt. No. 39 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrell v. Boeing Employees Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Farrell
Represented By: Therese S Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Employees Credit Union
Represented By: David J. Billings
Represented By: Eric Alan Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore Brewer & Wolfe
Represented By: David J. Billings
Represented By: Eric Alan Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?