North v. Rosenoff

Plaintiff: Gerald D.W. North
Defendant: Stephen Rosenoff
Case Number: 5:2016cv02829
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/16/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
December 19, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ROSENOFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING NORTH'S APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT. Re: Dkt. Nos. 29 35 . The amended complaint must be filed within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
August 1, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 14 . Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North v. Rosenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald D.W. North
Represented By: Heinz Binder
Represented By: Ryan Martin Penhallegon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Rosenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?