Des Roches et al v. California Physicians' Service et al

Plaintiff: Charles Des Roches and Sylvia Meyer
Defendant: California Physicians' Service, Human Affairs International of California and Magellan Health Services of California, Inc.-Employer Services
Case Number: 5:2016cv02848
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2017 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 156 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 5. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
September 18, 2017 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing re Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 5. Discovery Hearing set for 9/26/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/18/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
August 24, 2017 159 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 128 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 15, 2017 158 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 156 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/15/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 4, 2017 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 147 , 151 Discovery Dispute Joint Report Nos. 2 and 4. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 26, 2017 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 141 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 21, 2017 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 136 , 139 plaintiffs' July 18, 2017 discovery letter. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 19, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 136 plaintiffs' July 18, 2017 discovery letter. Defendants' response due by 7/20/2017, 2:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/19/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 15, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 86 Motion for Class Certification.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 1, 2017 120 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying without Prejudice 85 101 104 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
September 7, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 47 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/7/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Des Roches et al v. California Physicians' Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Des Roches
Represented By: Daniel L. Berger
Represented By: Jason S. Cowart
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Musarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Meyer
Represented By: Daniel L. Berger
Represented By: Jason S. Cowart
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Musarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Physicians' Service
Represented By: Joseph Edward Laska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Human Affairs International of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magellan Health Services of California, Inc.-Employer Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?