Nguyen v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Khoa Dang Nguyen
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA and John G. Stumpf
Case Number: 5:2016cv03043
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and construing Plaintiff's 17 Motion on the Discrimination and the Damage has caused by the Lender; 22 Motion on the Discrimination and the Damage Has Caused by Wells Fargo Bank; and 25 Motion on Ownership was Confirmed by Well Fargo Bank as oppositions to Defendant's motion to dismiss. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 15-cv-03043 NC and 13-cv-02986 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ADR REFERRAL FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL. Re: Dkt. No. 1 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/20/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khoa Dang Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?