Marilyn D Mintz v. Subaru of America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marilyn D. Mintz
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv03384
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 11, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 20, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING AS MOOT STIPULATED REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURES. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for September 26, 2016, is continued to D ecember 2, 2016, at 10:30 a.m.; an updated Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 23, 2016. Initial disclosures shall be provided no later than 14 days after the Court issues its ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 20, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
July 19, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO TRANSFER AND TO EXTEND TIME. The parties' stipulation to transfer is denied. The joint request for an extension of time is granted, and defendant shall have ten days from the date of this order to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marilyn D Mintz v. Subaru of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn D. Mintz
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?