Straight Path IP Group, Inc. v. Avaya Inc

Plaintiff: Straight Path IP Group, Inc.
Defendant: Avaya Inc
Case Number: 5:2016cv03459
Filed: June 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 40 BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/8/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
August 2, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRIAN P. BOYD PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 1, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (22 in 3:16-cv-03582-WHA) Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 26, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONFOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY NOAH GRAUBART PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 19, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF ATTORNEYS CHRISTOPHER O. GREEN AND NOAH GRAUBART by Judge Alsup denying 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 13, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/13/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Straight Path IP Group, Inc. v. Avaya Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avaya Inc
Represented By: Betty Hong Chen
Represented By: Noah Carey Graubart
Represented By: Christopher Owen Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Straight Path IP Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Neil Alan Rubin
Represented By: Andrew D. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?