Carnero et al v. Elk Grove Financial, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Jose R Carnero and Marta C Carnero
Defendant: Elk Grove Financial, LLC, Special Default Services, Inc. and Land Home Financial Services
Case Number: 5:2016cv03606
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 60 MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/25/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 6, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 , 38 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DENYING 57 MOTION TO STAY FORECLOSURE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/6/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
December 16, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO PROVIDE INFORMATION FOR SERVING LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/16/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
November 22, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 31 PLAINTIFFS' SECOND APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; AND DENYING 32 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RECORD A LIS PENDENS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/22/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnero et al v. Elk Grove Financial, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R Carnero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta C Carnero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elk Grove Financial, LLC
Represented By: Bruce Thomas Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Default Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Home Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?