Graves v. Mosqueda
Plaintiff: Harlan Dean Graves, Jr.
Defendant: Luis Mosqueda
Case Number: 5:2016cv03736
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/27/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/19/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 13 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/14/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves v. Mosqueda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlan Dean Graves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Mosqueda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?