Maldonado et al v. Apple, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Vicky Maldonado and JoAnne McRight
Defendant: Apple, Inc, Apple CSC Inc and Applecare Service Company Inc
Case Number: 5:2016cv04067
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 119 STIPULATION. Replies and corresponding motions to seal due by 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/29/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER - The hearing on the motions for summary judgment and class certification will be held on August 7, 2019 at 2 p.m. The change in the hearing date will not adjust the briefing schedule to which the parties have agreed. Hearing as to 100 , 103 MOTION to Certify Class continued to 8/7/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge W on 03/29/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within 20 days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference continued to 12/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/30/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado et al v. Apple, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Represented By: Ashley K Nakamura
Represented By: Purvi Govindlal Patel
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple CSC Inc
Represented By: Ashley K Nakamura
Represented By: Purvi Govindlal Patel
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applecare Service Company Inc
Represented By: Ashley K Nakamura
Represented By: Purvi Govindlal Patel
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Maldonado
Represented By: Peter D Kafin
Represented By: Renee Fagan Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnne McRight
Represented By: Peter D Kafin
Represented By: Renee Fagan Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?