LED One Distribution, Inc. v. C.S. Koida LLC et al

Plaintiff: LED One Distribution, Inc.
Defendant: C.S. Koida LLC and Jin Choi
Case Number: 5:2016cv04315
Filed: July 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 63 Motion to Transfer Case. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
February 15, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Compel Arbitration, filed by Jin Choi. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/15/2017. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
January 10, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 33 Motion to Vacate Default. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LED One Distribution, Inc. v. C.S. Koida LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LED One Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Delaney
Represented By: Fahim Farivar
Represented By: Ashley Marie McDow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.S. Koida LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?