Choi v. Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company et al

Plaintiff: Jay Jia Wen Choi
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company and Lockheed Martin Corporation
Case Number: 5:2016cv04337
Filed: August 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/2/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
November 17, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/17/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
September 14, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Lockheed Martin to file supplemental brief by 9/20/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/14/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
August 31, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Choi has until 9/7/2016 to file a response to Lockheed Martin's motion to dismiss. Consent or declination is due 9/7/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/31/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choi v. Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Jia Wen Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Space Systems Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Tammy Ann Brown
Represented By: Michael W. Foster
Represented By: Michael Eugene Wilbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?