DeVincenzi v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Daryl DeVincenzi
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc. and Roundpoint Mortgage Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv04628
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Dismissing With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/10/17. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 10, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 26 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
November 4, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order Denying Motions to Dismiss 8 17 as Moot, Denying as Moot 24 Motion for Leave to File, Vacating November 3, 2016 Order. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 3, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Finding Amended Complaint Untimely. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/3/16. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeVincenzi v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl DeVincenzi
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundpoint Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?