Robert Kragen v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Kragen
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Citigroup, Inc. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2016cv04644
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/3/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/19/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
March 23, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 DEFENDANT EXPERIAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/23/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
February 14, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUBMITTING 26 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT; VACATING HEARING; AND DENYING MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/14/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Kragen v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kragen
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?