Lugo v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Martha Lugo
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Bloomingdales, Inc., Macy's, Inc., TD Bank USA, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv04647
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/7/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2017. All other pretrial and trial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/2/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 15, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The hearing scheduled for 9/21/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/15/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
August 28, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY): The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 8/31/2017 is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the Order. It is further ordered that motion to appear telephonica lly ECF 81 is terminated as MOOT. The parties shall file a stipulation and proposed order to extend case management deadlines on or before 9/1/2017. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 5/3/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2018 1 1:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 5/29/2018 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 5/29/2018 01:30 PM. Jury Trial dates: 5/30, 5/31, 6/1/2018 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/28/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 22, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before 9/6/2017. The hearing scheduled for 8/24/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
May 19, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 , 33 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before 6/1/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/19/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
February 6, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/6/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lugo v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Lugo
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomingdales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Renee Choy Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?