Forsyth et al v. HP Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donna J. Forsyth, Sidney L. Staton, III, Arun Vatturi and Dan Weiland
Defendant: HP Inc. and Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv04775
Filed: August 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Order Granting 409 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Certification. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 04/13/2021. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Order Denying 401 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss and/or to Strike Improper Class Definitions from the Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/15/2020. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Order denying 384 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 21, 2020.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 371 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Order denying 346 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 7, 2020.The Hearing set for January 9, 2020 is VACATED.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER DENYING 158 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/17/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING 158 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DENYING 143 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENJOIN ARBITRATION; GRANTING 144 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/6/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER RE: 136 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/6/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING 134 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/10/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING 75 , 99 , 100 , 101 , 102 , 103 , 104 , 105 , 106 , 107 , 108 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DENYING 74 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/20/2017. The Clerk shall administratively close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING 126 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/8/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forsyth et al v. HP Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna J. Forsyth
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Douglas P. Dehler
Represented By: Paul Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney L. Staton, III
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Douglas P. Dehler
Represented By: Paul Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arun Vatturi
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Douglas P. Dehler
Represented By: Paul Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Weiland
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Douglas P. Dehler
Represented By: Paul Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin A. Emmert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Represented By: Benjamin A. Emmert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?