Ralph B. Neal v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ralph B. Neal
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 5:2016cv04923
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 47 Motion to Compel. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
March 6, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Prove Authority; denying 15 Motion to Remand. The hearing scheduled for 3/9/2017 is VACATED. The motion to appear telephonically 31 is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
September 6, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 5:16-cv-04923-HRL and 5:15-cv-03212-EJD. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/6/2016. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ralph B. Neal v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph B. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?