Davidson et al v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Davidson, Todd Cleary and Jun Bai
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv04942
Filed: August 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying 341 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class; Denying as Moot Apple's 362 Motion to Exclude Stefan Boedeker. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 352 Further Expert Depositions. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Order Reaffirming the Denial of Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Florida Deceptive and Unfair Trade Practices Act Claim. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/1/19. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 291 Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 272 Joint Discovery Dispute Letter re Scope of Discovery. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 273 Joint Discovery Dispute Letter re Apple's Production of Email Attachments and Embedded Images. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 179 , 181 Discovery Dispute 3. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 INTERIM ORDER re 179 Discovery Dispute Separate Report No. 3. If plaintiffs oppose the requested relief, they must file by 2/1/2018, 5:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/31/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 (REDACTED) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 152 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2; granting 151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF HEARING AND INTERIM ORDER re 129 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. Discovery Hearing set for 11/8/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Lead counsel shall appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/26/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 127 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/11/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 124 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/28/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Dismiss the Selected Claims in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Davidson
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Cleary
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Bai
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: David Ramraj Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?