Hadley v. Kellogg Sales Company
Plaintiff: Stephen Hadley
Defendant: Kellogg Sales Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv04955
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying Without Prejudice 325 Motion for Preliminary Approval.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Order re: Parties' Motions to Strike by Judge Lucy H. Koh. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 129 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DENYING 167 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF STEVEN P. GASKIN. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh 8/17/2018.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018) Modified on 8/17/2018 (iym, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying 111 Motion to Strike Answer and Enter Default ; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 111 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 63 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadley v. Kellogg Sales Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hadley
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Flynn
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Sales Company
Represented By: Kenneth Kiyul Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?