Sandhu v. Volvo Cars of North America, LLC

Plaintiff: Baljinder Sandhu
Defendant: Volvo Cars of North America, LLC and Smythe Volvo
Case Number: 5:2016cv04987
Filed: August 30, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO SANTA CLARA SUPERIOR COURT AND DENYING 23 DEFENDANT VOLVO CARS USA, LLC'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER DROPPING SMYTHE VOLVO AS A DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/31/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
December 27, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING ( 41 ) VCUSA'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/27/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016) Modified on 12/27/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY AND VCUSA'S RESPONSE THERETO. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/20/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandhu v. Volvo Cars of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baljinder Sandhu
Represented By: Benjeman R. Beck, Esq.
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Cars of North America, LLC
Represented By: Nasstaran Ruhparwar
Represented By: Garrett Sanderson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smythe Volvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?