Johnson v. Silvio Quattro, LLC

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Silvio Quattro, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv05188
Filed: September 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 26 Notice of Settlement. Status Conference/Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/12/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/11/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
January 20, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation TO EXTEND SITE INSPECTION DEADLINE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
December 22, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Site Inspection Deadline. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Silvio Quattro, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvio Quattro, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?