Frost v. LG Corporation et al

Plaintiff: A. Frost
Defendant: LG Corporation, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd, LG Display America, Inc., Samsung Group, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv05206
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/22/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING 85 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/27/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING 61 , 62 MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/21/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING 96 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/3/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING 75 SEALING MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/27/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 73 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/13/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. LG Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Frost
Represented By: Kyla Jenny Gibboney
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Represented By: Daniel David Birk
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Ergastolo
Represented By: John Harrison L'Estrange, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Schouten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel David Birk
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Ergastolo
Represented By: John Harrison L'Estrange, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Schouten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd
Represented By: Daniel David Birk
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Ergastolo
Represented By: John Harrison L'Estrange, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Schouten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel David Birk
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Ergastolo
Represented By: John Harrison L'Estrange, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Schouten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
Represented By: James L Cooper
Represented By: Anne Davis
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Chernof
Represented By: James L Cooper
Represented By: Anne Davis
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Chernof
Represented By: James L Cooper
Represented By: Anne Davis
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?