Stern v. Werner, et al

Plaintiff: Bernard Stern
Defendant: Thomas H. Werner, Charles D. Boynton, Arnaud Chaperon, Bernard Clement, Denis Giorno, Daniel Laure, Catherine A. Lesjak, Thomas R. McDaniel, Humbert De Wendell, Pat Wood, III and SunPower Corporation
Case Number: 5:2016cv05312
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Continuance of Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
December 27, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/27/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 13, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE AND TEMPORARY STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 15, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (14 in 3:16-cv-05381-RS), (15 in 3:16-cv-05988-RS), (11 in 3:16-cv-05312-RS) REGARDING CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS AND CASE MANAGEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 14, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting motion to relate cases 16-04710 RS, 16-04915 WHO, 16-05312 NC, 16-05381 NC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stern v. Werner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Stern
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Ciarlanto
Represented By: Joseph Mark Profy
Represented By: David M. Promisloff
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Boynton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnaud Chaperon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Giorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Laure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Lesjak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humbert De Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Wood, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunPower Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?