Orion Energy Systems, Inc. v. Green Creative LLC

Plaintiff: Orion Energy Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Green Creative LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv05581
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (pursuant to 20 joint motion) by Hon. William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
October 28, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 19, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 13 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KADIE M. JELENCHICK PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orion Energy Systems, Inc. v. Green Creative LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Creative LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orion Energy Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kadie M. Jelenchick
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?