Paul G. v. Monterey Peninsula Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Paul G.
Defendant: Monterey Peninsula Unified School District and California Department of Education
Case Number: 5:2016cv05582
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION 102 TO APPROVE MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/7/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING 55 DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/8/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 28 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/21/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul G. v. Monterey Peninsula Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul G.
Represented By: Christian Marie Knox
Represented By: Frank Richard Ruderman
Represented By: Daniel Robert Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Peninsula Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?