Madani v. County of Santa Clara
Plaintiff: Nayereh Madani
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Case Number: 5:2016cv07026
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 106 Motion to Enforce the Settlement.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 38 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 15 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madani v. County of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Karl Anthony Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nayereh Madani
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?