Yahoo!, Inc. v. MyMail, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Yahoo!, Inc.
Defendant: MyMail, Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2016cv07044
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/18/2018 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/8/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/27/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
October 5, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion to Dismiss; denying 57 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 58 Motion to Dismiss; scheduling trial setting conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 1, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to respond to motions. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 09/01/2017. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
July 11, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Davila denying without prejudice 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying without prejudice 32 Motion to Dismiss. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
May 18, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 38 DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF REGARDING RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION NOTICES TO YAHOO!, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/18/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yahoo!, Inc. v. MyMail, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahoo!, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Joseph Courtney
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hattenbach
Represented By: Ian Robert Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MyMail, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?