Barker v. Insight Global, LLC
Plaintiff: John Barker
Defendant: Insight Global, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv07186
Filed: December 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SEALING ORDER re 240 , 246 . Dkt. 241 to remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/6/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi in case 5:16-cv-07186-BLF; re (77), (78) Supplemental Discovery Dispute Letters in case 5:17-cv-00309-BLF. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 230 , 239 Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Insight Global. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER re Excerpts from Insight Global's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. Insight Global declaration(s) due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/24/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 229 , 230 Discovery Disputes. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re Deposition of Beacon Hill. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00309-BLF, 5:16-cv-07186-BLF (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 198 , 199 Discovery Disputes. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER RE NINTH CIRCUIT AUTHORITY. Defendant's counsel to provide referenced citations by close of business today. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/12/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Discovery Hearing set for 2/12/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Any joint discovery letter brief re Insight Global's Rule 30(b)(6) notice must be filed by 2/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/29/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 INTERIM ORDER re Pending Discovery Disputes. Joint status report due by 1/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/18/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING 189 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S ORDER AT ECF 176 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/11/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 186 Joint Discovery Letter re Litigation Funding. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER DENYING 181 DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/5/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 164 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/24/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 172 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 11. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 133 , 142 Discovery Dispute Joint Report Nos. 9, 10; granting in part and denying in part 132 Motion for Leave to File Declarations. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 INTERIM ORDER re 142 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/22/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 119 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 8; granting 118 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 120 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 7; granting 117 motion for leave to file declaration. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 61 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 105 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 5. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 107 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 6. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 INTERIM ORDER re 107 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/12/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 101 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 4. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DENYING 93 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/2/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 82 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 3; denying 83 defendant's administrative motion for leave to submit additional exhibits. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 75 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING 78 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/26/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Insight Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barker
Represented By: Tyler Mark Paetkau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Global, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Mittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?