Maquet Cardiovascular LLC v. Saphena Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maquet Cardiovascular LLC
Defendant: Saphena Medical, Inc. and Albert Chin
Case Number: 5:2016cv07213
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO ATTEND FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 3, 2018. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/26/2017. Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING [re 152 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Albert Chin, Saphena Medical, Inc.]. Response due by NOON on 8/21/2017. Three-hour meet-and-confer from 8:00 AM--11:00 AM 8/23/2017 in Court's jury room on the 19th floor. Discovery Hearing set for 8/23/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/17/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RE 86 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND 63 MOTION TO STAY, SEVER, OR BIFURCATE (granting 137 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/27/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER (1) GRANTING 87 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FILING DEADLINE AND (2) SETTING 86 BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/14/2017. Responses due by 6/22/2017. Replies due by 6/29/2017. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING 62 MOTION TO DISMISS AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE 63 MOTION TO STAY COUNTERCLAIM by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SECOND NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/16/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY VANESSA ARSLANIAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 37 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY WILLIAM UNSWORTH PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 34 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL BUNIS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 32 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PAUL POPEO PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING 29 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 25 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER ZIEGLER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 21 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maquet Cardiovascular LLC v. Saphena Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maquet Cardiovascular LLC
Represented By: Xavier Mark Brandwajn
Represented By: Michael S. Connor
Represented By: Christopher C. Zeigler
Represented By: Christopher Charles Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saphena Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Karen I. Boyd
Represented By: Margaret E Ives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Chin
Represented By: Karen I. Boyd
Represented By: Margaret E Ives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?