Aman Abye v. Yahoo! Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendant Yahoo! Inc. breached its Terms of Service, which incorporates its Privacy Policy, by failing to safeguard and limit use of plaintiff's personally identifiable information.

Plaintiff: Aman Abye and Louisa Ritsick
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv07354
Filed: December 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2017 10 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Arun Subramanian. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 5, 2017 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Arun Subramanian ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11051744.) filed by Aman Abye. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Subramanian, Arun) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 4, 2017 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against Yahoo! Inc.. Filed byAman Abye, Louisa Ritsick. (Sklaver, Steven) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
January 4, 2017 7 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint Waiving Service of Summons and Complaint, and Setting Deadline for Defendant Yahoo! Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 28, 2016 6 Summons Issued as to Yahoo! Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 27, 2016 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2017. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 27, 2016 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/10/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 27, 2016 3 Proposed Summons. (Sklaver, Steven) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 27, 2016 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Aman Abye . (Sklaver, Steven) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 27, 2016 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against Yahoo! Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11034415.). Filed byAman Abye. (Sklaver, Steven) (Filed on 12/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aman Abye v. Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aman Abye
Represented By: Seth D Ard
Represented By: Matthew Robert Berry
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Represented By: Marc M. Seltzer
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Arun Subramanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisa Ritsick
Represented By: Seth D Ard
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?