Ellis v. National Renewable Energy Center
Plaintiff: Terrace Ellis
Defendant: National Renewable Energy Center
Case Number: 5:2017cv00497
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $8557.00 against Energy Enterprise, USA Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying 51 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 WRIT of Execution issued against Energy Enterprise, USA Inc. in the amount of $8557.00 (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 37 Motion for Default Judgment; Adopting 43 Report and Recommendation. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order setting aside 25 entry of default as to Energy Enterprise USA, Inc, and terminating as moot 26 motion for default judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/27/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order deeming Second Amended Complaint properly filed signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/6/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. National Renewable Energy Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrace Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Renewable Energy Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?