Intri-Plex Technologies, Inc. v. NHK International Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Intri-Plex Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: NHK International Corporation, NHK Spring Co., Ltd., Ogaki Seiko Co., Ltd. and Seiko High Tec Corp.
Case Number: 5:2017cv01097
Filed: March 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 211 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen adopting 167 Report and Recommendation; and denying 170 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 137 TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TELEPHONICALLY ON SEPTEMBER 27, 2018 AT 10:30 AM. Parties shall make arrangements with Court Call. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/26/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 PUBLIC/REDACTED VERSION - ORDER Denying 90 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/18/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Amending Motion For Summary Judgment Briefing And Hearing Schedule filed by Intri-Plex Technologies, Inc. Responses due by 5/8/2018. Replies due by 5/17/2018. Motion Hearing reset for 5/31/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 87 , 88 Joint Letters of April 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 04/10/2018. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Re Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Claims Construction Hearing reset for 1/29/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 Stipulated Protective Order filed by Intri-Plex Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Intri-Plex Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intri-Plex Technologies, Inc. v. NHK International Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK International Corporation
Represented By: Marjie D. Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogaki Seiko Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seiko High Tec Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intri-Plex Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Michael Harrison Joshi
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?