Andersen Tax LLC v. Laffont-Reveilhac et al

Plaintiff: Andersen Tax LLC
Defendant: Stephane Laffont-Reveilhac, Veronique Martinez, Arthur Andersen & Co., SAS and MoHala Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 5:2017cv01311
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Arthur Andersen & Co., SAS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/31/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
June 16, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/16/2017. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
April 17, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant MoHala Enterprises, LLC D/B/A Sundial Consulting filed by Andersen Tax LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/17/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andersen Tax LLC v. Laffont-Reveilhac et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andersen Tax LLC
Represented By: John W. Crittenden
Represented By: Chantal Z Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephane Laffont-Reveilhac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronique Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Andersen & Co., SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MoHala Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?