UCAR Technology (USA) Inc. et al v. Yan Li et al
Plaintiff: UCAR Technology (USA) Inc. and UCAR Inc.
Defendant: Yan Li, Zhong Hua, Huo Da and Zhenzhen Kou
Case Number: 5:2017cv01704
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/3/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 73 Motion to Dismiss; granting 79 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/4/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss; granting 54 Motion to Dismiss counterclaims with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/15/2017. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISCHARGING 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UCAR Technology (USA) Inc. et al v. Yan Li et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCAR Technology (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Korula T. Cherian
Represented By: Robert Michael Harkins, Jr
Represented By: Don Francis Livornese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCAR Inc.
Represented By: Korula T. Cherian
Represented By: Robert Michael Harkins, Jr
Represented By: Don Francis Livornese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yan Li
Represented By: Michael Francis LaFond
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Kenneth K. Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhong Hua
Represented By: Michael Francis LaFond
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Kenneth K. Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huo Da
Represented By: Michael Francis LaFond
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Kenneth K. Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhenzhen Kou
Represented By: Michael Francis LaFond
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Kenneth K. Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?