Big Baboon, Inc. v. SAP America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Big Baboon, Inc.
Defendant: SAP America, Inc. and HP Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv02082
Filed: April 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order 83 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 82 Stipulation for Extension of Claim Construction Proceedings. Discovery due by 4/19/2019; Motions due by 5/3/2019; Responses due by 5/17/2019; Replies due by 5/24/2019; Tutorial Hearing set for 5/31/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor and Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/7/2019 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 81 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 80 Stipulation to Extend Dates re 58 Case Management Scheduling Order for Claim Construction Proceedings. Motions due by 3/22/2019; Responses due by 4/5/2019; Replies due by 4/12/2019; Tutorial Hearing set for 4/19/2019 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor; Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/26/2019 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 50 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 38 MOTION TO DISMISS, DENYING 42 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, AND DENYING 44 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2018. Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 40 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation to Revise Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' 38 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 20 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING 19 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Amended Pleadings due by 4/17/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 34 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to J. Christopher Carraway. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENTCONFERENCE, Motions terminated: 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 12 Clerk's Notice,, filed by HP Inc., SAP America, Inc... Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/26/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 18 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Reich, Lance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/26/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Baboon, Inc. v. SAP America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Baboon, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Edward Regan
Represented By: Robert H. Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAP America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?