Regional Medical Center of San Jose v. WH Administrators, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Regional Medical Center of San Jose
Defendant: WH Administrators, Inc., RHC Management Health & Welfare Trust, RHC Management Co., LLC d/b/a/ McDonald's, Benefit Administrative Systems, LLC and The Phia Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2017cv03357
Filed: June 9, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/2/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 13, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/13/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 10, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 26 STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regional Medical Center of San Jose v. WH Administrators, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WH Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHC Management Health & Welfare Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHC Management Co., LLC d/b/a/ McDonald's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefit Administrative Systems, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Frances Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phia Group, LLC
Represented By: Hector Emilio Salitrero
Represented By: Ryan Lee Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional Medical Center of San Jose
Represented By: Eric David Chan
Represented By: Glenn Edward Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?