Avocent Huntsville LLC. v. ZPE Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Avocent Huntsville, LLC
Defendant: ZPE Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv04319
Filed: July 28, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2018 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Infringement Contentions. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
March 21, 2018 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 17 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DENYING 36 , 51 MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick. 16 , 17 , 21 , 31 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal are granted. (The order image is redacted of confidential information; the unredacted order will be filed with access restricted to case participants.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 13, 2018 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 75 , 76 , 77 3/7/18, 3/8/18, 3/12/18 Discovery Letter Briefs. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
February 5, 2018 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding parties' 59 1/5/18 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avocent Huntsville LLC. v. ZPE Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZPE Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avocent Huntsville, LLC
Represented By: James D. Berquist
Represented By: Donald L. Jackson
Represented By: Robert H. Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?