Plexxikon Inc. v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Plexxikon Inc.
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 5:2017cv04405
Filed: August 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING Dkt. No. 394 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration of Motions to Seal. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINITFFS ( 262 , 260 ) MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 2 AND 3 AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS 268 MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANT'S 177 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting Plexxikon Inc.s 167 Motion for Summary Judgment of no Anticipation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 447 Stipulation Regarding Trial Re Docket No. 446 . Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. and Jury Selection /Jury Trial (2-week) set for 7/12/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. REGARDING ( 169 , 202 ) MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE DAMAGES EXPERTS OPINIONS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER REGARDING 202 MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. GREGORY K. LEONARD, PH.D. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/7/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER Granting 441 Joint Motion for Hearing Re Status Conference Re Trial Date. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/12/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line . The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are fu rther advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/6/2021 (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING ( 344 , 390 )MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 436 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Columbia, Sarah. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 433 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Kira Alexis Davis. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER GRANTING 425 Joint MOTION for Hearing Re Status Conference Re Trial Date. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/4/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/30/2020. This p roceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All c ounsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you co nnect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, pa rties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconferen ce are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 204 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF SUSANA ORTIZ-URDA. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 165 MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT'S TECHNICAL EXPERTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 179 MOTION TOSTRIKE PORTIONS OF EXPERT REPORT. **REDACTED VERSION** (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 200 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. MICHAEL L. METZKER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 407 Motion for Extension of Time to File Public Versions of Documents.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 236 MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS DAUBERT MOTIONS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ( 363 ; 366 ; 368 ; 374 ; 149 ; 164 ; 235 ; 242 ; 258 ; 261 ; 263 ; 265 ; 267 ; 282 ; 285 ; 287 ; 289 ; 291 ; 293 ; 295 ; 297 ; 299 ; 306 ; 314 and 332 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 157 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Schoenhard, Paul. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 373 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS 345 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 358 Stipulation re Leave to File Amended Joint Proposed Jury Instructions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 354 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/5/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2019 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/27/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 324 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. SETTING case management conference on August 29, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 255 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer B. Routh. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 249 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael S. Nadel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 239 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ian B. Brooks. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 180 Administrative Motion to Extend Time Modifying Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 159 Stipulation to Permit Deposition of Malackowski After the Expert Discovery Cutoff Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 89 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 114 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES WITH NON-PARTY. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 1, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 117 Stipulation to Permit Depositions After the Fact Discovery Cutoff Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE REGARDING LAB NOTEBOOKS. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 11, 2018. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 92 Stipulation.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 83 Motion for Pro Hac Vice AS TO Ryan T. McCleary. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan T. McCleary. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS VENUE-RELATED ( 33 , 37 ) MOTIONS. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2017; Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Eddie D. Woodworth. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mlaver, David. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Clouse, Katherine. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plexxikon Inc. v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plexxikon Inc.
Represented By: Andrew R Basile
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Raghav R. Krishnapriyan
Represented By: Clement S. Roberts
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?