Cadence Design Systems, Inc. v. Pounce Consulting, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cadence Design Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Pounce Consulting, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv04732
Filed: August 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/30/2019. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting in part and denying in part 181 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER RE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Document Production filed by Cadence Design Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 13, 2018. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER AND GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 07/17/2018. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER RE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL AND CASE SCHEDULE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 58 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying 58 Motion to Quash; denying 70 Administrative Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 103 Motion for Sanctions; denying 106 Motion to Strike ; denying 107 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES as to 65 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality of CAD_0000001 . Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/26/2018. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/17/2017. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/16/2017. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadence Design Systems, Inc. v. Pounce Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pounce Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadence Design Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Russell Jacobs
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Pasich
Represented By: Guy Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?