Finjan, Inc. v. Juniper Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Defendant: Juniper Network, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv05659
Filed: September 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 606 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/13/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER RE SHOW CAUSE ORDER (re 459 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/23/2019. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Discovery Order re 560 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/3/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER ON 544 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER RE MOTION TO QUASH AND 555 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Discovery Order re 543 Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/1/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 558 Discovery Order re 542 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/25/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/24/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 540 Discovery Order re 532 530 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/20/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO SEAL 535 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/19/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Discovery Order granting in part and denying in part the motion to seal. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/11/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 518 (Redacted) Discovery Order re ECF No. 510. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/6/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 511 Discovery Order. Response due June 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/4/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson denying 483 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Discovery Order re 484 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/23/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER ON 412 MOTION TO SET ASIDE VERDICT AND 409 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 451 **Counsel please note: This order was previously filed in docket no. 449 which you received yesterday, 4/25/2019. This Order is being re-posted to correct a docketing error by the Court, the Order has not changed in any way.**Discovery Order re: Order Denying Motion to Compel re Docket No. 429. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/25/2019. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Discovery Order re Docket No. 429. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/18/2019. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER ON 352 353 RENEWED MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/14/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER (re Motions in Limine 255 256 257 258 263 265 266 267 268 ). Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER RE 197 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER ON 198 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 199 Letter Brief filed by Juniper Network, Inc.]. Response due by NOON on 10/9/2018. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/4/2018. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 110 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 67 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup. Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 23 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finjan, Inc. v. Juniper Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Represented By: James R. Hannah
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Represented By: Austin W Manes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?