TVBI Company Limited v. Hong Thoa Thi Pham
Plaintiff: TVBI Company Limited
Defendant: Hong Thoa Thi Pham
Case Number: 5:2017cv05858
Filed: October 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DISMISSING CASE UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/28/19. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion in Limine; denying 113 Motion in Limine; granting 114 Motion in Limine; granting 124 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A COUNTERCLAIM denying 100 Motion for Leave to File; granting 105 Ex Parte Application. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE CHANGE OF DATE FOR TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENTgranting 85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 WRIT of of Attachment issued (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 3:13-cv-02492 SI and 5:17-cv-05858 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/12/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TVBI Company Limited v. Hong Thoa Thi Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TVBI Company Limited
Represented By: Lawrence James Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Thoa Thi Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?