Pace Anti-Piracy, Inc. v. Inside Secure et al

Plaintiff: Pace Anti-Piracy, Inc.
Defendant: Inside Secure and Inside Secure Corp.
Case Number: 5:2017cv05860
Filed: October 12, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2018 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 73 Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Order of Dismissal.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
April 10, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 62 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
March 16, 2018 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON RECENT FEDERAL CIRCUIT DECISION re Docket No. 37 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/16/18. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
January 30, 2018 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 50 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 46 Administrative Motion to Strike Re 45 Statement of Recent Decision. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 3, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule for Defendants' 37 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
December 21, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Stipulation for Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference and Accompanying Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2018; Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2018 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace Anti-Piracy, Inc. v. Inside Secure et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inside Secure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inside Secure Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pace Anti-Piracy, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Coleman
Represented By: C. Gideon Korrell
Represented By: John V. Picone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?