Kang v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: James C Kang
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2017cv06220
Filed: October 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING 115 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 114 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES; AND ADDRESSING 116 , 117 OBJECTION OF CLASS MEMBER KIRK E. FYSON. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/8/2021. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DENYING 119 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/14/2021. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021) Modified on 9/14/2021 (blflc1S, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 96 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/1/2021. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-06220-BLF, 5:21-cv-00071-BLF(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 62 AMENDED JOINT MOTION STIPULATING TO AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT,CERTIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S REST BREAK CLAIMS, AND STAY OF ACTION PENDING DECISION IN IBARRA MATTER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/27/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 40 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/6/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER STRIKING 42 DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO REFILE BRIEF ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 13, 2018; AND STRIKING 43 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/8/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kang v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Kang
Represented By: Joshua H. Haffner
Represented By: Paul Daniel Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Paul Berkowitz
Represented By: Jason Patrick Brown
Represented By: Thomas Roy Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?