In Re: Qualcomm Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Ryan Hart, All Plaintiffs, Michelle Mackay, Lisa Patnode, Gabriel Minon, Cynthia Bambini, Gail Margolis, Brandon Fuller, Susan Nagy, Laura Hallahan, Martha Countess, Thomas Lammel, Robert Links, Thomas McManus, Andre Cruz, Kendall Martin, Kate Mortensen, Carol Harris, Andrew Westley, Eden Wagner, Kevin Calero, Tom Parkin, Carmen Minon, Dalia Zatlin, Deirdre McElhaney, Dayan Crutcher, Lucas Rangel Ferreira, Masood Javaherian, Lindsey Carr, Betsy Santiago, Michelle Reynolds, Daniel Delier, Catherine Kaderavek, Hallie Lingo, Karen Stromberg, Karen Hood, Mary Galloway, Tina Heim, Rachel L. Miller, Caralyn Tada, Rodrigo Sapla, Nagore Miles, Paul Scott Ervin, George Marut, Kimberly Scavone, David Kreuzer, Scott Frederick, Charles Poon, Mary C McDevitt, Kirsten Luenz, David Floyd, Chris Thompson, Dwight Dickerson, Susan Gonzalez-Pender, Jason Schwartz, Nina Bartoshevich, David Waring, Todd Espinosa, Nicolas Yousif, Rebecca Davis, Catherine Schmidlin, Bethany Rising, Melissa Ju, Cordt Byrne, Gabrielle Kurdt, Allison Tripp, Beth Crandall, Allan Rotman, Shari Cole, Renee Acosta, Danielle LaGrave, Scott Hansen, Ericsson Broadbent, Samuel Roecker, Allison Shipp, Colleen Sparke, Joseph Kovacevich, Clarissa Simon, Elliot Carter, Debra Grasl, Adrian Esteban, Craig Housenick, Lori Landes, Crystal Hohenthaner, John William Kiefer, III, Melanie Barclay, James Clark, Leonidas Miras, Alan Schlaikjer, Monica Morrow, Thomas McMahon, Janet Silverness, Alyssa Nee, Jiying Spencer, Carlo Caringal, Suzanne Block, Nuala Vignoles, Stephan Farid Wozniak, Brandon Steele, Brian Depperschmidt, Andrea Hogan, Grant Hauschild, Amanda Newsome, Daniel Carroll, Richard Rizzo, Terese Russell, Nichelle Lyons, Paul Nelson, David Carney, John Solak, Steve Krug, Armando Herrera, Laurel Vener, Katie Smith, Patricia Burness, Matthew Christianson, Jordie Bornstein, Tiffany Ringo, Leon Theodore Lipka III, Daniel K. Brendtro, Peter Yee, Patrick Benad, Boardsports School LLC, Phillip James Zacharias, Logan Griesemer, David Koplovitz, Ian Carson, Jaime Martin, Matthew Mitchell, Christopher Zayas-Bazan, Seth Salenger, Jeff Ciotti, Erica Minon, Guy Dietrich, Javier Santiago, Kim Coughlin, Mary Beth Cummins, Padraic J Brennan, Julie Ewald, Alicia Hadnett, Sarah Key, William Horton, Ryan Margulis, Lindsay Smith, Jeffrey M Kurzon, Joyce Grantz, Jeffrey Davis, Karen Carlet, Guy Snowdy, Stephen Judge, Neil Wagner, Kyle Weber, Brian Letulle, Mark Cardillo, Christopher Whalen and Janet Ackerman
Defendant: Qualcomm Antitrust Litigation and Qualcomm Incorporated
Petitioner: NVIDIA Corporation and InterDigital, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd, SYNNEX Corporation, Best Buy Co., Inc., Non-Party Brightstar US, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Nokia Technologies OY, LG Electronics, Inc., Pegatron Corporation, Nokia USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Google LLC, Target Corporation, Wistron Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Lenovo (United States), Inc., ASUS Computer International, Amazon.com, Inc., MediaTek USA Inc. and MediaTek Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Motorola Mobility LLC, HTC America, Inc., Non-Party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Kyocera International, Inc., Ingram Micro Inc., US Cellular Corporation, Non-Party Blackberry, Compal Electronics, Inc., Intel Corporation, Essential Products, Inc., Verizon Wireless, Apple Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. and FIH Mobile Ltd.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Jennifer Milici
Interested Party: Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc., Sequans Communications, Inc. and Avanci LLC
Other: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017md02773
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 866 NOTICE of Change of Address by Meredith Richardson Dearborn and Gabriel R. Schlabach of Boies Schiller Flexner LLP (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 865 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Christopher Holtzman (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 864 ORDER of USCA: Intervenors motions to maintain under seal portions of volume 3 of the excerpts of record are granted. Within 14days after the date of this order, appellant shall submit a redacted volume 3 of the excerpts of record for public filing that redacts those portions of volume 3addressed in appellants motion to seal (Docket Entry No. 14) and intervenorsmotions to maintain the seal. The Clerk shall maintain under seal intervenors motions to maintain the seal. The existing briefing schedule shall continue in effect. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 863 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #815 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance With the Court's Order Approving the Form and Manner of Class Notice (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda V. Young, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ORDER of USCA as to #835 . Appellants motion to seal portions of volume 3 of the excerpts of record is granted. The Clerk shall file volume 3 of the excerpts of record under seal, and shall file the opening brief and volumes 1 and 2 of the excerpts of record publicly. Appellant also filed a notice of intent to file other portions of volume 3 of the excerpts of record publicly pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 2713(f). If appellees do not file a motion to seal those portions of volume 3 of the excerpts of record within 21 days after the filingof the notice, appellant shall submit a redacted volume 3 of the excerpts of record for public filing that redacts only those portions of volume 3 addressed in appellants motion to seal. The existing briefing schedule shall continue ineffect. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 861 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jill Michelle Manning (Manning, Jill) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 860 STATUS REPORT (Joint Mediation Status Report) by All Plaintiffs. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 859 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Noel Goodrich (Goodrich, Christina) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 858 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/11/2018, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #844 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 3/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2019. (Related documents(s) #844 ) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 857 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/27/2017, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #850 Transcript Order, #855 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2019. (Related documents(s) #850 , #855 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 856 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/5/18; 12/11/18 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Sarah Key, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 855 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/27/17 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Sarah Key, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 854 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/15/18 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Sarah Key, for Court Reporter Victoria Valine. (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 853 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/5/18 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Sarah Key, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 852 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/17/17 and 5/25/17 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Sarah Key, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 851 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/11/17; 11/15/17; 12/20/17; 3/28/18 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Sarah Key, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 850 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/27/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 849 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/15/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Victoria Valine. (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 848 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/5/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 847 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/17/2017; 5/25/2017; 2/22/2018; 12/6/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 846 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/6/2018; 4/18/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 845 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/22/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 844 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/5/2018; 12/11/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 2/14/2019) (TRANSCRIBER FOR 12/11/2018 PROCEEDINGS: AD HOC REPORTING) Modified on 2/14/2019 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2019 Filing 843 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/11/2017; 11/15/2017; 12/20/2017; 3/22/2018; 3/28/2018; 5/24/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 841 Order Regarding Dissemination of Class Notice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 1, 2019. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 840 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Request for Guidance Regarding the Dissemination of Class Notice (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 842 USCA Case Number 19-15159 Ninth Circuit. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/06/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/22/2019. Transcript due 03/25/2019. Appellant Qualcomm Incorporated opening brief due 05/03/2019. Appellees' answering brief due 06/03/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 839 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene A. Spector on behalf of Spector Roseman & Kodroff P.C. (Spector, Eugene) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL. The Court hereby STAYS the lawsuit pending the Ninth Circuit's disposition of Qualcomm's appeal and vacates all deadlines in this case. Within two business days of the Ninth Circuit's disposition of Qualcomm's appeal, the parties are ordered to file a joint statement with this Court. The Clerk shall administratively close the file. This is an internal administrative procedure that does not affect the rights of the parties. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/24/2019.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019) Modified on 1/25/2019 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2019 Filing 837 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 34611139886 re #835 USCA Order Granting Permission to Appeal (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 836 NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated (Notice that Appeal of Class Certification Order Has Been Perfected) (Hirsch, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 835 USCA ORDER re 18-80135 (RONALD M. GOULD and RICHARD A. PAEZ) Petitioners opposed motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition is granted. The reply has been filed. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district courts September 27, 2018 order granting class action certification. Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 834 Order Regarding Ninth Circuit Grant of Petition for Permission to Appeal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/23/2019. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 833 NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated Notice of Withdrawal of Jesselyn K. Friley (Friley, Jesselyn) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 832 Refund Status re #830 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 831 NOTICE of Change of Address by Carl Lawrence Malm (Malm, Carl) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 830 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26E29B7N by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Prati, Daniel) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 829 Refund Status re #828 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 828 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26E29B7N by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Prati, Daniel) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 827 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD ***TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/13/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018) Modified on 12/13/2018 (sp, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2018 Filing 826 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/6/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 825 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #822 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 824 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/11/2018 2:37:59 PM ]. File Size [ 9160 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:19:05 ]. (courtspeak).
December 11, 2018 Filing 823 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Discovery Hearing held on 12/11/2018: See minute order for Court's ruling. Attorney for Class Plaintiffs: Krysta Pachman. Attorney for Qualcomm: Jesselyn Friley. FTR Time: 2:37pm - 2:57pm (Total Time: 20 minutes). Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 822 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12918261.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Prati, Daniel) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 821 STATUS REPORT Joint Submission Regarding Expert Disputes by All Plaintiffs. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 820 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-6-18, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #813 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2019. (Related documents(s) #813 ) (las, ) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 819 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/6/18 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Sarah Key, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 818 CLERK'S NOTICE: Parties are to confer on expert discovery disputes presented in case management statement, ECF #806 , and by 12/7 to file a joint update either (1) stating that they have resolved the issues, or (2) presenting the disputed issues for decision. If there is a dispute, the Court will hold a hearing 12/11/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge Cousins. Counsel may participate by phone and must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to obtain the call-in number. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 817 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/6/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 816 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 6, 2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 815 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #783 Motion for Approval of Class Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline Version of Class Notice, #2 Exhibit Clean Version of Class Notice)(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 814 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/6/2018. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 813 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/06/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 812 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Motion to Approve Form and Manner of Class Notice #783 held on 12/6/2018 from 2:18 - 2:31 PM (13 minutes). A forthcoming Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the hearing. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): Kalpana Srinivasa and Mark. F. Ram. For Defendant(s): Robert A. Van Nest. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iymS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 811 **CLERK'S NOTICE** Further Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 810 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Approve Form and Manner of Class Notice, ECF No. #783 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 12/6/18 at 1:30 PM has been taken under submission without oral argument. The 12/06/18 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. The 12/6/2018 Further CMC shall be continued to a date set by a forthcoming Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. #814 . Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2019 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (iymS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 809 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #807 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 808 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Elizabeth Hucek (Hucek, Kristin) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 807 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Benjamin H. Diessel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12889629.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate)(Diessel, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 806 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 805 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #800 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 804 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #799 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 803 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #798 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 802 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #797 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 801 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #796 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 800 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829333.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/7/2018 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Collier, Marc) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 799 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829525.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/7/2018 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Hall, Eric) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 798 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829449.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/7/2018 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Hansum, Talbot) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 797 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829302.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/7/2018 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Leventhal, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 796 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829269.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/7/2018 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Zembek, Richard) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 795 Supplemental Brief re #783 MOTION to Approve the Form and Manner of Class Notice filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #783 ) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE #786 , #787 , #788 , #789 , #790 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 13, 2018. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 793 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 11/14/2018 Further Case Management Conference is HEREBY CONTINUED to 12/6/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW #784 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 9, 2018. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 790 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829525.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Hall, Eric) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 789 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829449.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Hansum, Talbot) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 788 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829333.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Collier, Marc) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 787 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829302.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Leventhal, Daniel) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 786 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12829269.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Zembek, Richard) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 785 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Sarah Key. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 784 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed) filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 11/15/2018. Replies due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney)(Geyer, Christopher) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 783 MOTION to Approve the Form and Manner of Class Notice filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Linda V. Young, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 782 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #778 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 781 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 10/24/2018 Further Case Management Conference is HEREBY CONTINUED to 11/14/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 780 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 779 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal regarding docket nos. #507 #620 filed by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Mark A. Ford, #4 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 23 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 45 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 47 (Redacted), #8 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, #9 Exhibit 7 (Redacted))(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 778 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 777 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #772 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 776 EXHIBITS re #773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Depo of Johnson - Highlighted, #2 Depo of Yang - Highlighted, #3 Reply ISO Class Cert - Highlighted, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Blevins Depo - Highlighted)(Related document(s) #773 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 775 EXHIBITS re #773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 40, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 56, #5 Exhibit 58, #6 Errata to Lasinski - Highlighted, #7 Errata to Elhauge 1 - Highlighted, #8 Errata to Elhauge 2 - Highlighted, #9 Errata Mtn for Class Cert - Highlighted, #10 Opp mts Flamm - Highlighted, #11 Nevo and Willig White - Highlighted, #12 Flamm Opp Decl - Highlighted)(Related document(s) #773 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 774 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re #770 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Mtn for Class Cert - Highlighted, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 24, #11 Exhibit 29, #12 Exhibit 32, #13 Exhibit 37)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 772 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matan Shacham, #2 Declaration of Geoffrey T. Holtz, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Opp. to Class Cert., #5 Unredacted Version of Opp. to Class Cert., #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit B to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit H to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #10 Under Seal Exhibit I to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #11 Under Seal Exhibit J to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #12 Under Seal Exhibit K to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #13 Under Seal Exhibit L to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #14 Redacted Version of Exhibit M to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #16 Under Seal Exhibit O to Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #17 Redacted Version of Motion to Strike, #18 Unredacted Version of Motion to Strike)(Shacham, Matan) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 771 USCA Case Number 18-80135 USCA-Ninth Circuit (Attachments: #1 Petition for Permission to Appeal)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 770 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Edward H. Takashima In Further Support of Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #496 , #516 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 769 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #768 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Errata (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 768 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Errata filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Errata Redacted Version of Errata, #4 Errata Unredacted Version of Errata, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhbiit A)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 767 Brief re #759 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Plaintiffs Reply to Defendant Qualcomms Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 (redacted) TEMPORARILY LOCKED)(Related document(s) #759 ) (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 10/5/2018) Modified on 10/18/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT 767-1 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #782 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/22/2018 (jy, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2018 Filing 766 Brief re #759 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12 (redacted) TEMPORARILY LOCKET, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15 (redacted), #6 Exhibit 16 (redacted), #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20 (redacted), #10 Exhibit 21 (redacted), #11 Exhibit 23,TEMPORARILY LOCKED #12 Exhibit 25 (redacted), #13 Exhibit 26 (redacted), #14 Exhibit 27 (redacted), #15 Exhibit 28 (redacted), #16 Exhibit 29 (redacted), #17 Exhibit 30 (redacted), #18 Exhibit 31 (redacted), #19 Exhibit 32 (redacted), #20 Exhibit 33, #21 Exhibit 36 (redacted), #22 Exhibit 37 (redacted), #23 Exhibit 42 (redacted), #24 Exhibit 43 (redacted), #25 Exhibit 44 (redacted), #26 Exhibit 46 (redacted))(Related document(s) #759 ) (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 10/5/2018) Modified on 10/18/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENTS 766-3 and 766-11 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #782 Modified on 10/22/2018 (jy, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2018 Filing 765 Brief re #759 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Opposition to Preliminary Injunction filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit Exhibit F Redacted, #4 Exhibit Exhibit G Redacted, #5 Exhibit Exhibit H Redacted, #6 Exhibit Exhibit I Redacted)(Related document(s) #759 ) (Friley, Jesselyn) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 764 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeff D Friedman (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 763 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying Without Prejudice #516 #597 #639 #641 #687 #692 #708 #721 #734 #738 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #457 Discovery Letter Brief #458 entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins pursuant to hearing held on 5/24/2018. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER GRANTING Administrative Motion #451 pursuant to hearing held on 5/24/2018 entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 760 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #524 Motion to Certify Class; Denying #643 Motion to Strike. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 759 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part #496 #572 #619 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 758 ***CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT*** The Motion for Class Certification and Motion to Strike (ECF Nos. #524 and #643 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 9/27/2018 at 1:30 PM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 9/27/18 hearings are VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 757 ERRATA re #756 Affidavit in Support of Motion to File Under Seal Dkt Nos. 721-724 by Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 756 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byBest Buy Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Anderson)(Related document(s) #721 ) (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 755 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Pursuant to the Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. No. 727) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 754 Declaration of James Ray Wood in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byZTE (USA) Inc.. (Related document(s) #721 ) (Horton, Timothy) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 753 NOTICE by Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc. re #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 752 Declaration of Scott Sanford in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAmazon.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) #721 ) (Ranganath, Ravi) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 751 Declaration of Nathan P. Eimer in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byLG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Related document(s) #721 ) (Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 750 Declaration of Lynn Yu in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byHTC America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #721 ) (Guess, Philip) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 749 Declaration of Sanghoon Park in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Related document(s) #721 ) (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 748 Declaration of Zoe Chen in Support of #708 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byPegatron Corporation. (Related document(s) #708 ) (Iwahashi, Ryan) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 747 Declaration of Edward H. Takashima in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #721 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 746 Declaration of Edward H. Takashima in Support of #708 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #708 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 745 Declaration of Ryan Iwahashi in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFIH Mobile Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., Wistron Corporation. (Related document(s) #721 ) (Iwahashi, Ryan) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 744 Declaration of Lisa Lin in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCompal Electronics, Inc.. (Related document(s) #721 ) (Iwahashi, Ryan) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 743 DECLARATION of Lisa Lin in Opposition to #708 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCompal Electronics, Inc.. (Related document(s) #708 ) (Iwahashi, Ryan) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 742 Declaration of Ryan Iwahashi in Support of #708 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFIH Mobile Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., Wistron Corporation. (Related document(s) #708 ) (Iwahashi, Ryan) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 741 Declaration of Michael Sowers in Support of #708 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byIngram Micro Inc.. (Related document(s) #708 ) (Sung, Paul) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 740 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #738 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal #708 (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 739 Declaration of Sanghoon Park in Support of #708 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Related document(s) #708 ) (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 738 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Justina Sessions ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal #708 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 UNDER SEAL - Qualcomm's Proposed Redactions - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Strike, #3 UNDER SEAL - Qualcomm's Proposed Redactions - Exhibit 1)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 737 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying as Moot #730 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 736 Declaration of Todd Madderom in Support of #708 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byLenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) #708 , #721 ) (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #735 Certificate of Service filed by Qualco mm Incorporated (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 735 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #734 (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 9/10/2018) Modified on 9/11/2018 linking entry to document #734 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2018 Filing 734 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Philip J. Fries ISO Plaintiffs Motion to File Under Seal #721 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan Weiser ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 UNDER SEAL - Qualcomm's Proposed Redactions - Plaintiffs' Reply, #4 UNDER SEAL - Qualcomm's Proposed Redactions - Exhibit 1, #5 UNDER SEAL - Qualcomm's Proposed Redactions - Exhibit 2, #6 UNDER SEAL - Qualcomm's Proposed Redactions - Exhibit 3)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 733 Declaration of Jana I. Seidl in Support of #722 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) #722 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 732 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sprint Spectrum L.P. re #731 Declaration in Support, (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 731 Declaration of Jennifer Riggs ISO Defendant Qualcomm Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (RE: Confidential Information of Non-Party Sprint Spectrum, L.P.) filed bySprint Spectrum L.P.. (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 730 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Justina Sessions in Support of Stipulation to Extend Deadline)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 729 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Lavery, Catriona) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DENYING QUALCOMM'S REQUEST TO EXCUSE UNTIMELY DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/7/2018. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 727 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part #612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 726 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #716 #719 Stipulations to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 725 REPLY (re #524 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. #728 . Further Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 724 EXHIBITS re #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 Redacted, #2 Exhibit 7 Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 8 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 8 Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 9 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 9 Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 10 Redacted, #8 Exhibit 10 Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 11 Redacted, #10 Exhibit 11 Unredacted)(Related document(s) #721 ) (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 723 EXHIBITS re #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 Redacted, #2 Exhibit 4 Unredacted)(Related document(s) #721 ) (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 722 EXHIBITS re #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Redacted, #2 Exhibit 1 Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 2 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 2 Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 3 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 3 Unredacted)(Related document(s) #721 ) (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krysta Kauble Pachman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Reply Redacted, #4 Reply Unredacted)(Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 720 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sprint Spectrum L.P. re #719 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 719 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 718 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part #707 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5; Order on Procedures for Administrative Motions to Seal.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 717 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 716 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 filed by Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 715 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs on Non-Party Lenovo and Motorola (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 714 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs on Non-Party Samsung (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 713 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs on Non-Party Brightstar (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 712 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs on Non-Party Ingram Micro (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 711 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #708 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service List)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 710 Declaration of Rio S. Pierce in Support of #709 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Rio S. Pierce in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Qualcomm Inc.'s Motion to Strike the Declaration of Kenneth Flamm filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #709 ) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 709 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #643 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Kenneth Flamm ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Qualcomm Inc.'s Motion to Strike the Declaration of Kenneth Flamm filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 708 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rio Pierce In Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Qualcomm's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Kenneth Flamm, #4 Exhibit Unredacted version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Qualcomm's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Kenneth Flamm, #5 Exhibit Unredacted version of Pierce Decl. Ex. 1, #6 Exhibit Redacted version of Pierce Decl. Ex. 2, #7 Exhibit Unredacted version of Pierce Decl. Ex. 2, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Pierce Declaration Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Pierce Declaration Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Pierce Declaration Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Pierce Declaration Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Pierce Declaration Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Pierce Declaration Exhibit 8)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 707 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadlines Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 706 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying Without Prejudice #507 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 705 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #507 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously set for 8/30/18 at 1:30 PM has been taken under submission without oral argument. The 8/30/18 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 704 Declaration of E. Takashima in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 703 Declaration of Jennifer Rho in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byHon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 702 Declaration of Ellisen S. Turner in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm, #687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #641 filed byT-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) #641 , #687 ) (Turner, Ellisen) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 701 Declaration of Lynn Yu in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byHTC America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Guess, Philip) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 700 Declaration of Jana I. Seidl In Support of Dkt. #687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 8/24/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 linking entry to document #687 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2018 Filing 699 Declaration of Todd Madderom in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm, #687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #641 filed byLenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) #641 , #687 ) (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 698 Declaration of Jennifer Johnston in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byVerizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #641 ) (Cote, Alexander) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 697 Declaration of David Chong in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm, #687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #641 filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Related document(s) #641 , #687 ) (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 696 Declaration of Monica Huang in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byWistron Corporation. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 695 Declaration of Zoe Chen in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byPegatron Corporation. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 694 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #692 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 693 ERRATA to Qualcomm's Motion to Strike by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Cody Harris in Support of Qualcomm's Errata to Motion to Strike and Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 692 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Cody Harris in support of Qualcomm's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Errata Redacted Version of Errata to Qualcomm's Motion to Strike, #5 Errata Unredacted Version of Errata to Qualcomm's Motion to Strike, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 691 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byBest Buy Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Anderson, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #641 ) (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 690 Declaration of Scott Sanford in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm (Re: Confidential Information of Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc.) filed byAmazon.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Ranganath, Ravi) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 689 Declaration of Jason N. Zimmer in Support of #687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #641 filed byUS Cellular Corporation. (Related document(s) #687 ) (Suozzi, Angelo) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 688 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #641 (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #641 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Corrected Proposed Order - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [641-3], #2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit H - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [641-11])(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 686 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #666 #667 #668 #670 #671 #672 #673 #675 #676 #678 #680 #684 Stipulations to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 685 DECLARATION of Steven M. Geiszler in Opposition to #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byHuawei Device U.S.A. Inc.. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 684 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed by Essential Products, Inc.. (Snell, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 683 Declaration of Andrew N. Kohn in Support of Qualcomm's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNon-Party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kohn, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 682 Declaration of Nathan P. Eimer in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byLG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 681 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 680 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 679 Declaration in Support of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed byASUS Computer International. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Masur, Joshua) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 678 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by HTC America, Inc.. (Guess, Philip) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 677 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Verizon Wireless re #675 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 (Cote, Alexander) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 676 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Compal Electronics, Inc., FIH Mobile Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., Pegatron Corporation, Wistron Corporation. (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #655 Certificate of Service, filed by Qual comm Incorporated, #654 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #650 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #663 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #658 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #649 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #648 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #661 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #651 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #645 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #646 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #664 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #656 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #652 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #647 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #662 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #660 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #657 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #644 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #665 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #659 Certificate of Service, filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. PLEASE REFER TO THE COURT'S WEBSITE REGARDING E-FILING TUTORIAL AND TRAINING (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 675 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Verizon Wireless. (Cote, Alexander) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 674 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Best Buy Co., Inc. re #673 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm Stipulation and [Proposed] O Certificate of Service Regardig Dkt 673 (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 673 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 Regarding DKT 641 filed by Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 672 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Turner, Ellisen) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 671 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Ranganath, Ravi) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 670 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 669 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated Third Party Fry's - AMENDED (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 668 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #642 Opposition/Response to Motion, #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 667 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5 filed by US Cellular Corporation. (Suozzi, Angelo) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 666 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm - Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 665 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Essential Products (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 664 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Brightstar (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 663 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Blackberry (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 662 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Best Buy (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 661 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party AT&T (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 660 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #64 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Samsung (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 659 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Newegg (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 658 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Asus (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 657 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Motorola (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 656 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Winstron (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 655 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party LGE (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 654 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Walmart (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 653 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Amazon (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 652 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Huawei (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 651 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Verizon (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 650 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party US Cellular (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party HTC (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 648 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party T-Mobile (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 647 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Fry's (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 646 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Target (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 645 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Sprint (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018. Counsel failed to link entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2018 Filing 644 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 643 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Kenneth Flamm filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/30/2018. Replies due by 9/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 642 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #524 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justina Sessions, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Qualcomms Opposition to Class Certification, Accompanying Exhibits, and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matan Shacham, #2 Declaration of Geoffrey T Hotlz, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Opposition to Plts Motion for Class Cert, #5 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Plts Motion for Class Cert., #6 Redacted Version of Motion to Strike the Declaration of Kenneth Flamm, #7 Unredacted Version of Motion to Strike the Declaration of Kenneth Flamm, #8 Under Seal Exhibit A to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #9 Under Seal Exhibit B to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #10 Under Seal Exhibit D to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #11 Under Seal Exhibit H to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #12 Under Seal Exhibit I to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #13 Under Seal Exhibit J to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #14 Under Seal Exhibit K to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #15 Under Seal Exhibit L to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #16 Under Seal Exhibit M to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #17 Under Seal Exhibit N to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #18 Under Seal Exhibit O to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert., #19 Under Seal Exhibit P to Declaration of Justina Sessions Declaration ISO Opp. to Class Cert.)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 640 ERRATA re #524 MOTION to Certify Class by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krysta Kauble Pachman in Support of Plaintiffs' Errata to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krysta Kauble Pachman in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 Public, #4 Exhibit 1 Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 2 Public, #6 Exhibit 2 Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 3 Public, #8 Exhibit 3 Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 4 Public, #10 Exhibit 4 Under Seal, #11 Errata to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - Public, #12 Errata to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - Under Seal)(Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 638 REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/7/2018. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Private Mediation with a deadline of 11/1/18. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 637 NOTICE of Change of Address by Asim M. Bhansali (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 636 Declaration of Mark D. Sewlyn in Support of #619 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byIntel Corporation. (Related document(s) #619 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 25, 2018 Filing 635 STATUS REPORT ADR Joint Status Report by Sarah Key. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 634 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #632 Request to Change Hearing Date on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 633 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #631 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 632 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Change Hearing Date on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 631 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Deadline) filed by Plaintiffs, Qualcomm Incorporated and Non-Party Intel Corporation. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/23/2018) Modified on 8/15/2018 correcting filer information and removing Mark Selwyn as counsel for Qualcomm(dhmS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2018 Filing 630 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Verizon Wireless re #626 Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Cote, Alexander) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 22, 2018 Filing 629 Declaration of E. Takashima in Support of #612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #612 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 7/22/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 628 Declaration of Jana I. Seidl in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT ADR STATUS REPORTS, AND DENYING QUALCOMM'S REQUEST FOR OUT-OF-TIME DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/20/2018. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 626 Declaration of Jennifer Johnston in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byVerizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Cote, Alexander) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 625 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sprint Spectrum L.P. re #618 Declaration in Support, Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 624 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #619 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 623 Declaration of Sanghoon Park in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #617 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #614 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. (783 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Further Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #618 Declaration in Support, filed by Spri nt Spectrum L.P. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 620 REPLY (re #507 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Qualcomm's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #8 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 619 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krysta Kauble Pachman in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Public Version of Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Qualcomm's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Qualcomm's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Redacted Public Exhibit 7 to Kalpana Srinivasan's Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, #6 Unredacted Exhibit 7 to Kalpana Srinivasan's Declaration)(Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 618 Declaration of Jennifer Riggs in Support of #516 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 7/19/2018) Modified on 7/20/2018 linking entry to document #516 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2018 Filing 617 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Lee, Elizabeth Anne) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 616 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 615 Declaration of James R Wood in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Sealing ZTE documents)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Horton, Timothy) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 614 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Extend Deadline to file Declaration filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Horton, Timothy) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 613 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Alan Horton for ZTE (USA) INC. (Horton, Timothy) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Brent Byars, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Joint Case Management Statement, #4 Unredacted Joint Case Management Statement)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #549 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 610 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #585 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 609 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #585 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Class Certification and Daubert Motion ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Qualcomm, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Deadline for Opposition to Class Certification and Daubert Motion filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krysta Kauble Pachman in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Qualcomm, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Deadline for Opposition to Class Certification and Daubert Motion)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 608 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re #605 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #599 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 607 Declaration of Nathan P. Eimer in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byLG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 606 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed byIntel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Redactions- Flamm Declaration, #2 Proposed Redactions- Elhauge Declaration)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 605 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Declaration of Edward H. Takashima filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B [UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C [UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D [UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E [UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F [UNDER SEAL], #7 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #496 , #516 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 604 Declaration of Joe Lam in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byHon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 603 Declaration of Edward H. Takashima in Support of #572 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Qualcomms Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Exhibits filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #572 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 602 Declaration of Monica Huang in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWistron Corporation. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 601 Declaration of Zoe Chen in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byPegatron Corporation. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 600 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryn Anderson Williams (Williams, Bryn) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 599 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #496 , #516 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 598 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #597 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Fabian Gonell ISO Plaintiffs Motion To File Under Seal #516 (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 597 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Fabian Gonell ISO Plaintiffs Motion To File Under Seal #516 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey T. Holtz ISO Plaintiffs Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Jonathan Weiser ISO Plaintiffs Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Proposed Order, #4 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification, #5 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Exhibit 4, #6 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Exhibit 5, #7 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Exhibit 6, #8 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Exhibit 10, #9 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Exhibit 14, #10 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Exhibit 17, #11 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Exhibit 37, #12 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Exhibit 52, #13 UNDER SEAL-Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-Exhibit 58)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 596 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc. re #592 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #593 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 595 Proposed Order re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 594 Declaration of Andrew N. Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNon-Party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kohn, Andrew) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 593 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Steven Geiszler filed byHuawei Device U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Public Pages - Exhibit 56 - Ding Deposition Transcript - Redacted Public Version, #2 Public Pages from Declaration of Dr Kenneth Flamm - Redacted Public Version, #3 Public Pages from Declaration of Einer Elhauge - Redacted Public Version, #4 Public Pages from Declaration of Michael J Lasinski - Redacted Public Version, #5 Public Pages from Class Certification Motion - Redacted Public Version)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 592 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Steven M Geiszler filed byHuawei Device U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit 56 - Ding Deposition Transcript, #2 Sealed Pages from Declaration of Dr Kenneth Flamm, #3 Sealed Pages from Declaration of Einer Elhauge, #4 Sealed Pages from Declaration of Michael Lasinski, #5 Sealed Pages from Class Certification Motion)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 591 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Administrative Motion and Declaration of Scott Anderson in Support thereof filed byBest Buy Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 590 Declaration of STEVEN C. HOLTZMAN in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMediaTek USA Inc. and MediaTek Inc.. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 589 Declaration of Susanna Martikainen in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNokia Technologies OY, Nokia USA Inc.. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 588 STATUS REPORT ("Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated, Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission and MDL Plaintiffs' Joint Status Report") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 587 Declaration of Mark H. Hamer in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAvanci LLC. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Hamer, Mark) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 586 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byUS Cellular Corporation. (Suozzi, Angelo) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 585 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Class Certification and Daubert Motion filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 584 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (RE: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION OF NON-PARTY AMAZON.COM, INC.) filed byAmazon.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Ranganath, Ravi) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 583 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #571 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 582 Declaration of Andrew L. Lucarelli in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEricsson Inc.. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 581 Declaration of Todd Madderom in Support of #572 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Qualcomms Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Exhibits filed byLenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) #572 ) (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 580 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Verizon Wireless re #571 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #524 MOTION to Certify Class Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 (Cote, Alexander) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 579 DECLARATION of Todd Madderom in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motions to Seal, Dkt. Nos. #496 & #516 filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ira Blumberg in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motions to Seal, Dkt. Nos. 496 & 516, #2 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Administrative Motions to Seal, Dkt. Nos. 496 & 516, #3 Exhibit 4 (Flamm Decl) Lenovo & Motorolas Proposed Redactions Unredacted Version UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 4 (Flamm Decl) Lenovo & Motorolas Proposed Redactions Redacted Version, #5 Exhibit 5 (Elhauge Decl) Lenovo & Motorolas Proposed Redactions Unredacted Version UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 5 (Elhauge Decl) Lenovo & Motorolas Proposed Redactions Redacted Version, #7 Exhibit 6 (Lisinki Decl) Lenovo & Motorolas Proposed Redactions Unredacted Version UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 6 (Lisinki Decl) Lenovo & Motorolas Proposed Redactions Redacted Version)(Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified text on 7/13/2018 (confirm with document posted by counsel). 7/13/2018,***not a motion***(cv, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #579 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Declaration of Todd Madderom in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motions to Seal, Dkt. Nos. 496 & 516 filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Fabian Gonell in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal #496 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, #512 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, Docket No. 496 filed by Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 578 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Intel (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 577 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Lenovo (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 576 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party Apple (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 575 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated on Third Party FTC (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 574 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #572 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Qualcomms Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Exhibits (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 573 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #507 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cody S. Harris, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 572 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Qualcomms Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Exhibits filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cody S. Harris, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Qualcomms Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #4 Unredacted Version of Qualcomms Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #5 Under Seal-Exhibit D to Decl. of CHarris ISO Qualcomms Oppo to Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #6 Under Seal-Exhibit E to Decl. of CHarris ISO Qualcomms Oppo to Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #7 Under Seal-Exhibit F to Decl. of CHarris ISO Qualcomms Oppo to Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #8 Under Seal-Exhibit G to Decl. of CHarris ISO Qualcomms Oppo to Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #9 Under Seal-Exhibit H to Decl. of CHarris ISO Qualcomms Oppo to Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #10 Under Seal-Exhibit I to Decl. of CHarris ISO Qualcomms Oppo to Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 571 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #524 MOTION to Certify Class Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Verizon Wireless. (Cote, Alexander) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #568 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #567 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 568 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 Regarding Dkt. 516 filed by Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 567 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Non-Party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Kohn, Andrew) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #553 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 565 Declaration of Ellisen Turner in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byT-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Turner, Ellisen) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 564 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #552 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 563 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #551 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 562 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #547 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #546 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #545 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #543 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 558 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #542 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #541 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 556 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #540 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #539 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 554 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #544 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 553 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Compal Electronics, Inc., FIH Mobile Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., Pegatron Corporation, Wistron Corporation. (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 552 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Intel Corporation. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 551 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 FOR NON-PARTIES NOKIA USA INC. AND NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY filed by Nokia Technologies OY, Nokia USA Inc.. (Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 550 EXHIBITS re #549 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Doc. No. 524-4, #524 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Flamm)(Related document(s) #549 , #524 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 549 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Doc. No. 524-4 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 548 Declaration of David Bass in Support of #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTarget Corporation. (Related document(s) #516 ) (Semaan, Amanda) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 547 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 546 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 filed by Non-Party Brightstar US, Inc.. (Allen, David) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 545 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by US Cellular Corporation. (Suozzi, Angelo) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 544 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12495885.) filed by US Cellular Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Suozzi, Angelo) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 543 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXTENDING DEADLINE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Ranganath, Ravi) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 542 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 541 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 filed by MediaTek USA Inc. and MediaTek Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 540 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dkt. 516 EXTENDING DEADLINE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 539 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by NVIDIA Corporation. (Malm, Carl) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #535 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 537 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #531 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #529 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 535 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dkt. 516 EXTENDING DEADLINE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 filed by Ericsson Inc.. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 534 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #527 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #526 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #525 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 531 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 530 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Lavery, Catriona) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 529 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Avanci LLC. (Hamer, Mark) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 528 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark H. Hamer (Hamer, Mark) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 527 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 526 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Stipulation Extending Time to Respond)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 525 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 524 MOTION to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/9/2018. Replies due by 9/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Kalpana Srinivasan, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 *** EXHIBIT 4 FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8-10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12-24, #11 Exhibit 25, #12 Exhibit 26-59)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/5/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT(S) 524-4 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #611 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/19/2018 (jy, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2018 Filing 523 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 55, #2 Exhibit 56, #3 Exhibit 57, #4 Exhibit 58, #5 Exhibit 59)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 522 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 45, #2 Exhibit 46, #3 Exhibit 47, #4 Exhibit 48, #5 Exhibit 49, #6 Exhibit 50, #7 Exhibit 51, #8 Exhibit 52, #9 Exhibit 53, #10 Errata 54)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 521 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 39, #4 Exhibit 40, #5 Exhibit 41, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 43, #8 Exhibit 44)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 520 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 34, #10 Exhibit 35, #11 Exhibit 36)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 519 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 22, #7 Exhibit 23, #8 Exhibit 24)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 518 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 517 EXHIBITS re #516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Errata 9)(Related document(s) #516 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of the Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Unredacted Version of the Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 515 ***CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION #507 FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FOR HEARING*** Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/30/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 514 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Fabian Gonell in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal #496 (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 513 DECLARATION of Fabian Gonell in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal #496 filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-UNDER SEAL-Plf's Mtn for Prelim Injuction, #3 Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-UNDER SEAL-Exhibit 20, #4 Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-UNDER SEAL-Exhibit 21, #5 Qualcomms Proposed Redactions-UNDER SEAL-Exhibit 30)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 7/2/2018) Modified text on 7/13/2018 (confirm document posted by counsel). 7/13/2018,***not a motion*** (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2018 Filing 512 DECLARATION in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, Docket No. #496 filed by Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order , #2 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, #3 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service BY NON-PARTY HUAWEI DEVICE (Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 7/2/2018) Modified text on (confirm document posted by counsel). 7/13/2018,***not a motion*** (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 511 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #510 Stipulation to Extend Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 29, 2018 Filing 510 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 509 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Key re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Lavery, Catriona) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL Portions Of Non-party Apple Inc. And Defendant Qualcomm's Joint Status Report #470 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 507 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/12/2018. Replies due by 7/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Barring Qualcomm from Pursuing Selective Exclusion of Competing Chipsets in the International Trade Commission, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Barring Qualcomm From Pursuing Selective Exclusion of Competing Chipsets in the International Trade Commission, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3-38, #6 Exhibit 39, #7 Exhibit 40, #8 Exhibit 41, #9 Exhibit 42-49, #10 Exhibit 50)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 506 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36, #2 Exhibit 37, #3 Exhibit 38, #4 Exhibit 42, #5 Exhibit 43, #6 Exhibit 44, #7 Exhibit 45, #8 Exhibit 46, #9 Exhibit 47, #10 Exhibit 48, #11 Exhibit 49)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 505 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29, #10 Exhibit 30, #11 Exhibit 31, #12 Exhibit 32, #13 Exhibit 33, #14 Exhibit 34, #15 Exhibit 35)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 504 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 Part 2 of 2)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 503 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 Part 1 of 2)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 502 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 501 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 Part 3 of 3)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 500 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 Part 2 of 3)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 499 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 Part 1 of 3)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 498 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 497 EXHIBITS re #496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #496 ) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 496 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Unredacted Version of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 495 Answer to Amended Complaint #490 Amended Complaint Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint byQualcomm Incorporated. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 494 STATUS REPORT ("Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated, Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission and MDL Plaintiffs' Joint Status Report") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 493 NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated (Notice of Withdrawal of David Rizk) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 492 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 6/20/2018 Further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 7/25/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 491 NOTICE by Renee Acosta, Patricia Burness, Carol Harris, Robert Links, Nichelle Lyons, Nuala Vignoles Notice of Change of Firm Name and Attorney Contact Information (Cikes, Steve) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 490 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Qualcomm Incorporated. Filed byAll Plaintiffs, Leonidas Miras, James Clark. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 489 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 488 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 6/13/2018 further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 6/20/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iymS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 487 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 486 STATUS REPORT by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 2, 2018 Filing 485 Statement ("Non-Party Apple Inc. And Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Supplemental Discovery Statement") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 6/2/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 484 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 24, 2018, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (482 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order, (480 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order, (481 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order, (754 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 6/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2018. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 482 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/24/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 5/25/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2018 Filing 481 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/24/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 5/25/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2018 Filing 480 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/24/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 5/25/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2018 Filing 483 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Discovery Hearing held on 5/24/2018:*See minute order for the Court's rulings* Attorneys for Qualcomm: Yonatan Even, Geoffrey Holtz, Cody Harris. Attorney for FTC: Daniel Matheson. Attorney for MDL Plaintiffs: Rio Pierce. Attorney for Apple, Inc.: Edward Takashima. Attorneys for Ingram Micro, SYNNEX Corp.: Daniel Sasse, Paul Sung. (FTR Time: 2:48pm-3:55pm/4:11pm-4:54pm.) Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 479 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 478 Declaration of Eric Maurer in Support of #470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Of Non-party Apple Inc. And Defendant Qualcomm's Joint Status Report filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #470 ) (Maurer, Eric) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RESCHEDULING THE MAY 23 DISCOVERY HEARING TO MAY 24 #472 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK and #747 in 5:17-cv-00220 LHK. Discovery Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2018 02:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/21/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 476 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Todd Anthony Seaver (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 475 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Todd Anthony Seaver (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 474 Letter Brief re #468 Discovery Letter Brief Plaintiffs' Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Production Of Qualcomm Transactional Data ("Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Opposition To Plaintiffs' Separate Statement In Support Of Motion To Compel Production Of Qualcomm Transactional Data") filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Related document(s) #468 ) (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 473 Letter Brief re #467 Discovery Letter Brief Plaintiffs' Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Qualcomm Financial Planning and Analysis Materials ("Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Opposition To Plaintiffs' Separate Statement In Support Of Motion To Compel Production Of Qualcomm Financial Planning & Analysis Materials") filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Related document(s) #467 ) (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 472 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 20, 2018 Filing 471 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Discovery Letter Briefs #467 , #468 , #469 in 5:17-md-02773 LHK and #742 , #743 , #744 , #745 in 5:17-cv-0220 LHK. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. No phone appearances. Apple, Inc. must also be present. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2018)
May 19, 2018 Filing 470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Of Non-party Apple Inc. And Defendant Qualcomm's Joint Status Report filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Gary Bornstein, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Joint Status Report, #4 Under Seal Joint Status Report)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 5/19/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 469 Statement Plaintiffs' and Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Discovery Statement Regarding Interrogatory Responses and 30(b)(6) Testimony by All Plaintiffs. (Peaslee, Katherine) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 468 Discovery Letter Brief Plaintiffs' Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Production Of Qualcomm Transactional Data filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 467 Discovery Letter Brief Plaintiffs' Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Qualcomm Financial Planning and Analysis Materials filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #465 Stipulation Re: Deadline for Filing Motions to Compel Further Fact Discovery.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 465 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #432 Order re Deadline for Filing Motions to Compel Further Fact Discovery filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 464 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING Re: Discovery Letter Briefs #450 , #451 , #455 , #457 , #458 . Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 463 STATUS REPORT ("Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated, Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission and MDL Plaintiffs' Joint Status Report") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 462 NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated ("Notice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 44.1 Of Intent To Raise Issues Of Foreign Law") (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 461 NOTICE by Sarah Key Notice of Agreement (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 460 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #458 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #457 Discovery Letter Brief ) re Synnex Corporation's Motion for Leave to Submit Declaration of Bo Li filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 459 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #451 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #450 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Brightpoint North America LLC (Ingram Micro Inc.) for Leave to Submit Declaration of Tresia Warner in Support of Non-Party Ingram Micro Inc.'s Position in Joint Disco ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Non-Party Ingram Micro Inc.'s Administrative Motion for Leave to Submit Declaration of Tresia Warner in Support of Position in Joint Discovery Letter Brief Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 458 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #457 Discovery Letter Brief filed by SYNNEX Corporation. Responses due by 5/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit A - Bo Li, #2 Declaration Exhibit B - Paul I. Sung, #3 Proposed Order in Support of Administrative Motion)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 457 Discovery Letter Brief filed by SYNNEX Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 456 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Allen Sasse and Paul I. Sung (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 455 Discovery Letter Brief re Synnex Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 454 NOTICE of Appearance by Matan Shacham (Shacham, Matan) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 453 NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated (Notice of Withdrawal of David W. Rizk) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 452 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on May 4, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (721 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, (720 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2018. (rhm) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 451 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #450 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Brightpoint North America LLC (Ingram Micro Inc.) for Leave to Submit Declaration of Tresia Warner in Support of Non-Party Ingram Micro Inc.'s Position in Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ingram Micro Inc.. Responses due by 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration EX. A - Declaration of Tresia Warner, #2 Declaration EX. B - Declaration of Paul I. Sung, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order in Support of Administrative Motion)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 450 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Brightpoint North America LLC (Ingram Micro Inc.) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 449 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Allen Sasse and Paul I. Sung (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 448 NOTICE of Change of Address by Asim M. Bhansali (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #446 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 2, 2018 Filing 446 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Maurer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12319554.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Maurer, Eric) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/1/2018. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. #445 in 17-MD-2773 and ECF No. 711 in 5:17-CV-00220-LHK. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 444 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by Catriona Lavery (Lavery, Catriona) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 23, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing re (706 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK). Further Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/23/2018. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 441 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sarah Key. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 440 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Notice of Withdrawal of Carel Ale) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 439 NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated (Notice of Withdrawal of David W. Rizk) (Rizk, David) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 438 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/18/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/19/2018)(TRANSCRIBER: RAYNEE MERCADO) Modified on 4/19/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2018 Filing 437 NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated of Withdrawal of Stefan H. Atkinson (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 436 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Discovery Hearing held 4/18/2018: *See minute order for Court's rulings* Attorney for Qualcomm: Yonatan Even. Attorney for FTC: Kenneth Merber. Attorney for MDL Plaintiffs: Rio Pierce. Attorney for Non-party Intel: Timothy Syrett. (FTR Time: 2:20pm-2:37pm/3:02pm-3:27pm.) Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2018) Modified on 4/20/2018 to reflect corrected FTR Time) (lmh, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2018 Filing 435 STATUS REPORT ("Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated, Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission and MDL Plaintiffs' Joint Status Report") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 434 STATUS REPORT Non-Party Apple Inc. and Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Status Report by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 433 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 6, 2018, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (431 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order, (680 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, (679 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2018. (rhm) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 6, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings pursuant to ECF No. #432 . Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Class Certification Hearing set for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Hearing on Dispositive Motions set for 4/4/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Jury Trial (8 day estimate) set for 6/24/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 432 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/6/2018. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 431 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/06/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 430 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04-06-2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 429 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/6/2018 from 11:08 - 12:07 p.m. and 12:08 - 12:25 p.m. (1 hour and 16 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 4/24/218 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement by 4/23/2018 at 5:00 p.m. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): Kalpana Srinivasan and Rio Pierce, personally present. Elizabeth A. Gillen, Jennifer Milici, and Daniel J. Matheson, all appearing telephonically. For Defendant(s): Gary A. Bornstein and Justina K. Sessions, personally present. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 428 STATUS REPORT Unredacted - Non-Party Apple Inc. and Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Status Report by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGE RE-REVIEW FOR QUALCOMM AND APPLE Re: #426 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/4/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 426 Statement in Support of [Proposed] Order Regarding Privilege Re-Review by Qualcomm and Apple by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pierce, Rio) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 425 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Victoria Samuels (Samuels, Chelsea) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 423 Statement ("Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's and Non-Party Intel Corporation's Joint Discovery Statement") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Ryan, Antony) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 422 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 28, 2018, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (657 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, (417 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order, (659 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 4/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER FOLLOWING MARCH 30 DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT. Re: Dkt. No. #663 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/30/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER ON PROPOSED PRIVILEGE RE-REVIEW PROTOCOLS. Re: Dkt. Nos. #411 , #412 (in-2773). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/3/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 419 STATUS REPORT by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 418 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Scott Tester (Tester, Walter) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 417 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/28/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 3/29/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 3/29/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2018 Filing 416 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Discovery Status Hearing held on 3/28/2018 re Qualcomm-Apple issues: See ECF #408 for agenda; Hearing held publicly and no parts sealed. Court granted clawback of two documents by Apple 22482289-96 and 4898-4906 after in camera review. Previewed clawback dispute of a third document. Q&A to address in March 30 joint status report. Court also heard arguments by MDL plaintiffs, FTC, Qualcomm, and Apple as to privilege log issues set forth in ECF 410, 411, and 412. Taken under submission. Further order to come on privilege log review protocol. Finally, Apple sought reconsideration of sealing order as to mediation issues. Court permitted motion to be filed. No further discovery hearings scheduled presently. Attorneys for Qualcomm: Gary Bornstein, Yonatan Even. Attorney for MDL Plaintiffs: Rio Pierce. Attorneys for FTC: Joseph Baker, Elizabeth Gillam. Attorney for Apple: Edward Takashima. FTR Time: 3:14pm - 3:56pm. (Time in Court: 42 mins) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 415 Statement re #370 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, [Unredacted] Plaintiffs' Statement for Appointment of Special Master by All Plaintiffs. (Pierce, Rio) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 414 STATUS REPORT Non-Party Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Report in Support of Clawbacks by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 413 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Court will address the Joint Status Reports, Dkt. Nos. #411 and #412 at the Discovery Hearing set for 03:00 PM today. Counsel may join the hearing by telephone and must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to obtain the call-in number. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 412 Statement Regarding Revision to Proposed Review Protocol by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Pierce, Rio) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 411 STATUS REPORT ("Joint Status Report") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit A)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 410 STATUS REPORT ("Joint Status Report") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL STATUS REPORT. Re: Dkt. No. #629 in 17-cv-0220 LHK. Re: Dkt. No. #386 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK.Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER ON QUALCOMM-APPLE DISCOVERY ISSUES FOLLOWING MARCH 23 STATUS REPORT; SETTING HEARING ON MARCH 28. Re: Dkt. No. #647 (in-00220), #405 (in-02773). Discovery Hearing set for 3/28/2018 03:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel may participate by phone upon advance to the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/26/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR UNREDACTED EC DECISION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL. Re: Dtk. Nos. #354 , #357 . Sigend by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 406 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/22/2018, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (401 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 23, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. #403 . Class Certification Hearing set for 8/2/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 405 STATUS REPORT by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 404 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 22, 2018, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (638 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, (642 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 403 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/23/2018. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 402 NOTICE by Qualcomm Incorporated (Notice of Withdrawal of Alexander Dryer) (Rizk, David) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 401 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 22, 2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Sarah Key, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 400 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 399 *** DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR (INCORRECT ECF EVENT AND CANCELLED VIA EMAIL) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 3/22/2018) Modified on 3/26/2018 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2018 Filing 398 Brief re #381 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Non-Party Apple Inc.'s Brief Regarding Apple/Samsung Common Interest Agreement filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #381 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 397 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/22/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 3/22/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 3/23/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2018 Filing 396 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Discovery Hearing held on 3/22/2018: Plaintiffs' motion to compel production from Qualcomm metadata so as to discover "email thread groups" denied for lack of good cause, as not proportional to the needs of the case at this point of the proceedings. The Court noted that the Court approved an agreed ESI protocol on July 3, 2017, Dkt. No. #142 in 17-220 LHK at p. 4, permitting production of the "longest unique chain" of email. The Court expressed concern at assertion of late-produced documents by Qualcomm, but deferred remedy (such as re-deposition) until a witness-by-witness analysis could be performed. Attorneys for MDL Plaintiffs: Amanda Bonn, Rio Pierce. Attorney for Qualcomm: Gary Bornstein. (FTR Time: 1:08pm - 1:28pm.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 395 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/22/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT. Re: Dkt. Nos. #368 , #383 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 393 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/22/2018 from 1:46 - 2:35 PM and 2:48 - 3:40 PM (1 hour and 41 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 4/6/18 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. By April 3, 2018, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): Amanda Bonn and Rio Pierce, personally present, and Elizabeth A. Gillen and Joseph Baker, both appearing telephonically. Defendant(s): Gary A. Bornstein, Robert A. Van Nest, and Justina K. Sessions. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER GRANTING Non-Party T-Mobile's Assented-To Motion to Amend the Supplemental Protective Order #390 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #389 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 390 MOTION T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Assented-To Motion To Amend Supplemental Protective Order filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Responses due by 4/4/2018. Replies due by 4/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 389 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12205563.) filed by NVIDIA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Malm, Carl) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 388 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ("Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement") filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 387 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-22-18, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #347 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2018. (Related documents(s) #347 ) (las, ) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 386 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Status Report filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Takashima, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Joint Status Report, #4 Sealed Joint Status Report)(Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER REGARDING THE COURT'S IN CAMERA REVIEW OF QUALCOMM'S PRIVILEGE LOG. Re: Dkt. No. #591 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/16/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER RE THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY AND UPDATING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/16/2018. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 383 Declaration of Yonatan Even in Support of #368 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority Regarding Applicable Standard of Attorney-Client Privilege in Response to #380 Order to Show Cause filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Related document(s) #368 ) (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 382 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL. Re: Dkt. No. #605 in case 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Re: Dkt. No. #371 in case 5:17-md-02773-LHK. Apple is ORDERED to refile its brief consistent with Civil Local Rule 79-5(f)(2). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING QUALCOMM'S MISSING DECLARATION. Re: Dkt. No. #368 . Qualcomm must file this declaration by tomorrow, March 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/15/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 379 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING Re Plaintiff's request for production of Qualcomm metadata, set forth in ECF #376 at 5:18-27. Discovery Hearing set for 3/22/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 378 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adam Zapala re Withdrawal of Philip L. Gregory (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 377 STATUS REPORT by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 376 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sarah Key. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #373 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 7, 2018 Filing 374 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Qualcomm Incorporated. Amended Exhibit A. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 7, 2018 Filing 373 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12168534.) filed by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Korman, Robert) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 372 Brief Non-Party Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s Statement Regarding Common Interest Agreement filed bySamsung Electronics Co, Ltd. (Caseria, Leo) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 371 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Apple Inc's Brief Regarding Apple/Samsung Common Interest Agreement filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Non-Party Apple Inc.'s Brief Regarding Apple/Samsung Common Interest Agreement, #4 Unredacted Version of Non-Party Apple Inc.'s Brief Regarding Apple/Samsung Common Interest Agreement)(Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL AS MODIFIED. Re: Dkt. Nos. #343 , #353 , #363 . Plaintiffs are ORDERED to refile the discovery letter brief consistent with Civil Local Rule 79-5(f)(2). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #365 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 5, 2018 Filing 368 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority Regarding Applicable Standard of Attorney-Client Privilege filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 [Redacted] Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority Regarding Applicable Standard of Attorney-Client Privilege Law, #3 [Unredacted] Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority Regarding Applicable Standard of Attorney-Client Privilege Law, #4 Declaration of Rio S. Pierce, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2 [Sealed], #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4 [Sealed], #9 Exhibit 5 [Sealed], #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8 [Sealed], #13 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 5, 2018 Filing 367 Brief re #352 Order filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Related document(s) #352 ) (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 5, 2018 Filing 366 ***CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MARCH 8, 2018 CMC*** Pursuant to this notice, the 3/8/2018 further CMC is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 5, 2018 Filing 365 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12159632.) filed by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Miller, Elise) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 364 STATUS REPORT ("Joint Status Report") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 363 Declaration of Yonatan Even filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit B, #2 Amended Exhibit C)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 362 Declaration of Asim Bhansali in Support of #354 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Related document(s) #354 ) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 1, 2018 Filing 361 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sarah Key. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
March 1, 2018 Filing 360 RESPONSE to re #359 Response to Order to Show Cause, Plaintiffs Opposition To Qualcomms Response To Order To Show Cause Regarding European Commission Decision by Sarah Key. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 28, 2018 Filing 359 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Qualcomm Incorporated Qualcomms Response To Order To Show Cause Regarding European Commission Decision. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Cody S. Harris In Support of Qualcomms Response To Order To Show Cause Regarding European Commission Decision, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 27, 2018 Filing 358 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Shawn Harris (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING EUROPEAN COMMISSION DECISION. Re: Dkt. No. #355 . Qualcomm must respond to this order by tomorrow, February 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/27/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 27, 2018 Filing 356 RESPONSE to re #355 Status Report Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Response to Plaintiffs' Status Report Re Qualcomm's Redactions to European Commission Decision by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 Filing 355 STATUS REPORT Regarding Qualcomm's Redactions to European Commission Decision by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Bonn, Exhibit A (REDACTED), and Exhibits B-J)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 Filing 354 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Exhibit A (REDACTED) to the Declaration of Amanda Bonn ISO Plaintiffs' Status Report Re Qualcomm's Redactions to European Commission Decision, #4 Exhibit A (UNREDACTED) to the Declaration of Amanda Bonn ISO Plaintiffs' Status Report Re Qualcomm's Redactions to European Commission Decision)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 Filing 353 Declaration of Yonatan Even in Support of #343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Statement for Appointment of Special Master filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Related document(s) #343 ) (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER ON MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF DISCOVERY SPECIAL MASTER (Re: Dkt. Nos. 585 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK and 343 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/24/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 351 STATUS REPORT by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 350 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 22, 2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 349 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/22/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/15/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Lindsey Carr, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 2/23/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: VICTORIA VALINE). Modified on 2/27/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2018 Filing 347 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/22/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 346 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/22/2018. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 345 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/22/2018 from 1:34PM to 2:34PM (1 hour). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines and rulings from the Conference. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 3/8/2018 and 3/22/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Joint Case Management Statements to be submitted 3/1/2018, 3/8/2018, 3/15/2018, 3/22/2018 and 3/29/2018. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Oscar Rivera. For Class Plaintiffs: Amanda Bonn, Michael Montano, Joseph Cotchett and Jeff Friedman. For Qualcomm: Asim Bhansali. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/22/2018)
February 21, 2018 Filing 344 Statement and [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Request for Appointment of a Special Master by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 21, 2018 Filing 343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Statement for Appointment of Special Master filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 [UNREDACTED] Statement for Appointment of Special Master, #3 [REDACTED] Statement for Appointment of Special Master, #4 Proposed Order Appointing Special Master, #5 Declaration of Rio S. Pierce, #6 Exhibit [UNREDACTED] Exhibits A to C)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 342 STATUS REPORT Non-Party Apple Inc.'s Status Report Regarding Document Production by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 341 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/15/2018, before Judge Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Valine, telephone number victoriavalinecsr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #339 Transcript Order, #337 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 3/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2018. (Related documents(s) #339 , #337 ) (vlv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 339 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/15/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 2/16/2018)(TRANSCRIBER: VICTORIA VALINE) Modified on 2/16/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2018 Filing 340 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Discovery Hearing (In re ECF Nos. 540 and 545-4 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK and ECF Nos. 290, 291, 302, 536, 540, 545 and 553 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) held on 2/15/2018. As to Qualcomm/Apple disputes,1. Issue of sanctions against Apple that was remanded from Judge Koh, deferred pending further discovery and briefing.2. Apple made representations as to anticipated further productions and privilege log revisions. Apple represented to the Court that it would provide Qualcomm with an updated privilege log by 2/19.3. Apple and Qualcomm by 2/23 to file joint status report update, including conferring and resolving date and location for deposition of former GC. 4. Court took under submission Qualcomm request as to Apple/Samsung in camera review. Order to issue.Dkt 540, FTC request to Qualcomm for re-review of certain privilege log entries.1. Parties (and non-party Apple) discussed the pros and cons of appointment of discovery special master. Parties ordered to confer further and to file specific proposals by 2/21. Court to issue order.2. FTC request for immediate re-review of privilege log entries denied without prejudice, subject to further consideration of special master.3. Class counsel's request for privilege log re-review granted in part and denied in part. As to the 2 witnesses being deposed next week, class counsel ordered to identify by 2/16 at noon 500 documents for each witness (out of approximately 2,500 previously identified); Qualcomm to re-review those log entries, amend log as appropriate, and produce responsive non-privileged documents (if any) by 2/20 at 5:00 pm, pacific time.Dkt 545, Qualcomm request to FTC for certain third party communications: denied. Court not persuaded the requests seek information that is relevant and proportional to the needs of the case. Court did not reach work product assertion.FTR Time: 1:47 to 2:59 and 3:48 to 4:13 (1 hr. and 37 mins.) Attorney(s) for Class Plaintiff(s): Rio Pierce. Attorney(s) for FTC: Jennifer Milici. Attorney(s) for Qualcomm: Yonatan Even, Gary Bornstein and Asim Bhansali. Attorney(s) for Apple: Edward Takashima. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/15/2018)
February 15, 2018 Filing 338 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 15, 2018 Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/15/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 2/15/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: VICTORIA VALINE) Modified on 2/16/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2018 Filing 336 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/05/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 2/13/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: ECHO REPORTING) Modified on 2/13/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2018 Filing 335 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 02/05/18, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number 8584537590. Tape Number: FTR 3:10 - 3:45/4:06 - 4:29. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #329 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 3/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2018. (Related documents(s) #329 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #332 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #331 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 332 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Patrick M. Lafferty ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12106212.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Lafferty, Patrick) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 331 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Abby L. Dennis ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12106204.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Dennis, Abby) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 330 STATUS REPORT Qualcomm-Apple Joint Status Report by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 329 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/05/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: ECHO REPORTING) Modified on 2/12/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2018 Filing 328 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING Re: Joint Discovery Statements #536 , #540 , #545 , #553 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK; #317 in 5:17-md-02773 LHK. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER DENYING APPLE'S MOTION TO SEAL. Re: #536 in case 5:17-cv-00220-LHK; #317 in case 5:17-md-02773-LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL STATUS REPORT. Re: Dkt. Nos. #481 , #548 in 17-cv-00220 LHK. Re: Dkt. Nos. #289 , #324 in 17-md-02773 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #267 Motion For Relief From Magistrate Judge's Nondispositive Pretrial Order Imposing Sanctions.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 Filing 324 Declaration of Edward H. Takashima in Support of #289 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Non-Party Apple Inc. and Defendant Qualcomm's Joint Status Report filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #289 ) (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 Filing 323 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING DISCOVERY HEARING Re: Qualcomm and Apple disputes at Dkts. Nos. #290 , #291 , #302 . Hearing reset for 2/15/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER REGARDING MISSING OR INCOMPLETE DECLARATIONS TO MOTIONS TO SEAL. Re: Dkt. Nos. #481 , #506 , #529 , #535 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK and #289 , #300 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK. The Court ORDERS Apple and Huawei to file declarations consistent with this order under Local Rule 79-5(e) by tomorrow, February 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/6/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 321 CLERK'S NOTICE: Apple to submit in camera the disputed Common Interest Agreement by 2/12 noon. See Dkt. #317 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 320 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING Re: Qualcomm and Apple disputes at Dkts. #290 , #291 , #302 . Hearing set for 2/14/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties to file a joint discovery status update by 2/12 5:00 PM that updates information submitted in Dkt. #290 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 DISCOVERY ORDER RE: INTEL CORP. DEPOSITIONS. Re: Dkt. Nos. #519 in 17-cv-00220, #312 in 17-md-02773. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 318 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Discovery Hearing held on 2/5/2018 re #524 #529 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK: See minute order. #519 in 5:17-cv-00220 LHK and #312 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK: Court to issue order summarizing its ruling. Attorneys for Qualcomm: Antony Ryan, Gary Bornstein. Attorney for FTC: Elizabeth Gillen. Attorneys for Class Plaintiffs: Brian Danitz, Rio Pierce. Attorney for Non-party Intel: Mark Ford. Attorney for Huawei Device USA: David Giardina. (FTR Time: 3:10pm-3:45pm/4:06pm-4:29pm.) Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2018).
February 5, 2018 Filing 317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Statement Regarding Production of a Common Interest Agreement filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Discovery Statement, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Discovery Statement)(Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 316 REPLY (re #267 MOTION For Relief From Magistrate Judge's Nondispositive Pretrial Order Imposing Sanctions re #252 Transcript,,,, #250 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,,,,,,,, ) filed byApple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #293 Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge's Nondispositive Pretrial Order.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 314 Declaration of Mark A. Ford in Support of #312 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed byIntel Corporation. (Related document(s) #312 ) (Ryan, Antony) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 313 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING Re: Joint Discovery Letter Brief #312 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK and #519 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Motion hearing set for 2/5/2018 03:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 312 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Intel Corporation, Qualcomm Incorporated. (Ryan, Antony) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 311 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims by Plaintiff Andrew Westley by Andrew Westley (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 310 Declaration of Gary A. Bornstein in Support of #309 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Related document(s) #309 ) (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 309 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #267 MOTION For Relief From Magistrate Judge's Nondispositive Pretrial Order Imposing Sanctions re #252 Transcript,,,, #250 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,,,,,,,, ) filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #306 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Peaslee (Peaslee, Katherine) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 306 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12053946.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Brooks, Roger) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #303 Stipulation Regarding Discovery Coordination.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesselyn K Friley (Friley, Jesselyn) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 303 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery Coordination filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Carlson, James) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 302 RESPONSE to re #291 Statement ("Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Submission Regarding Apple's Compliance with the Court's Ordered Production Deadlines") by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 301 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 1/24/2018 further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 2/22/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO SEAL. Re: Dkt. #481 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Re: Dkt. No. #289 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/19/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT QUALCOMM'S MOTION to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from LG Electronics, Inc. #298 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Request to the Competent Authority for the Republic of Korea for International Judicial Assistance)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018) Letter sent to Morgan Lewis via courier on 1/26/2018. Modified on 1/26/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing: re (507 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Clerk's Notice. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 298 MOTION to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from LG Electronics, Inc. (Unopposed) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. Responses due by 2/1/2018. Replies due by 2/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yonatan Even, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part #292 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 296 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #292 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Produce Documents ) filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard J. Stark, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Stark, Richard) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 295 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adam John Zapala re: Withdrawal of Attorney Joyce Chang (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 294 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 293 MOTION Relief from Magistrate Judge's Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order Compelling Production of Documents filed by Compal Electronics, Inc., FIH Mobile Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., Pegatron Corporation, Wistron Corporation. Responses due by 1/30/2018. Replies due by 2/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Lo, #2 Exhibit A to Lo Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Lo, Jason) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 13, 2018 Filing 292 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Produce Documents filed by Compal Electronics, Inc., FIH Mobile Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., Pegatron Corporation, Wistron Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Lo, #2 Proposed Order)(Lo, Jason) (Filed on 1/13/2018)
January 12, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing re (288 in 5:17-md-0773-LHK and 480 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Order Hearing on Apple's Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge's Nondispositive Pretrial Order set for 2/15/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 291 Statement ("Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Submission Regarding Apple's Compliance with the Court's Ordered Production Deadlines") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 290 STATUS REPORT ("Joint Status Report") by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 289 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Non-Party Apple Inc. and Defendant Qualcomm's Joint Status Report filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary Bornstein, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Joint Status Report, #4 Under Seal Joint Status Report)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Order Setting Schedule for Apple Inc.'s Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge's Nondispositive Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/12/2018. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #281 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #280 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #279 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #278 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #277 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan R. Chesler (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 281 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12021777.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Atkinson, Stefan) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 280 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12021725.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 279 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12021698.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Carlson, James) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 278 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12021670.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Lavely, Vanessa) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 277 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12021582.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 276 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 5, 2018, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (451 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding the Disclosure of Privileged or Protected Information Produced Without Manual Review. #461 in case 5:17-cv-00220-LHK; #272 in case 5:17-md-02773-LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IN PROCURING EVIDENCE FROM LG ELECTRONICS, INC. (Dkt. No. 448 in 17-cv-0220). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #(1) Letter of Request to the Central Authority for the Republic of Korea for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters - Unredacted version remains SEALED by Court order) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 272 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ("Proposed Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding the Disclosure of Privileged or Protected Information Produced Without Manual Review") filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Letter of Request to the Central Authority for the Republic of Korea (Dkt. No. 449 in 17-cv-0220). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/8/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #269 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for the Production of Certain Documents by Non-Party Sequans Communications, Inc.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 269 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for the Production of Certain Documents by Non-Party Sequans Communications, Inc. filed by Sequans Communications, Inc.. (Cooper, Monte) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 268 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Discovery Hearing re Joint Status Report re Apple's Document Production held on 1/5/2018: See minute order for specifics. Attorney for Qualcomm: Gary Bornstein. Attorney for Apple, Inc.: Edward Takashima. (FTR Time: 1:16pm - 1:38pm.) Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/5/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 267 MOTION For Relief From Magistrate Judge's Nondispositive Pretrial Order Imposing Sanctions re #252 Transcript,,,, #250 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,,,,,,,, filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2018. Replies due by 1/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Takashima, #2 Declaration of B. Kellermann, #3 Proposed Order)(Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #264 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 265 NOTICE by Janet Ackerman, Laura Hallahan Request to Remove Primary and Secondary Email from Case following Voluntary Dismissal of Member Cases (Maxwell, K.C.) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 264 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 266TJP5J.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/2/18 filed by Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Short, Floyd) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #261 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for the Production of Certain Documents by Non-Party Apple Inc.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
December 31, 2017 Filing 262 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING re Non-Party Apple, Inc. and Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Status Report Regarding Apple's Document Production. Hearing set for 1/5/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2017)
December 29, 2017 Filing 261 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS BY NON-PARTY APPLE INC. filed by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 29, 2017 Filing 260 STATUS REPORT REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING Non-Party AT&T Mobility LLC's Assented-To Motion to Supplement Protective Order #257 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Regarding the Disclosure of Potentially Privileged or Protected Information Produced Without Manual Review #427 in case 5:17-cv-00220-LHK; #256 in case 5:17-md-02773-LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 28, 2017 Filing 257 MOTION for Protective Order - Non-Party AT&T Mobility LLC's Assented-To Motion to Supplement Protective Order filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Responses due by 1/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 28, 2017 Filing 256 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE OF POTENTIALLY PRIVILEGED OR PROTECTED INFORMATION PRODUCED WITHOUT MANUAL REVIEW filed by Non-Party Blackberry. (Paris, Adam) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 28, 2017 Filing 255 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 1/3/2018 further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 1/24/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 27, 2017 Filing 254 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 27, 2017 Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 12/27/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 12/28/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2017 Filing 252 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 20, 2017, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (423 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, (414 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, (418 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, (417 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, (416 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 1/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2018. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #240 Administrative Motion to Amend the Order Appointing Interim Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Class Counsel.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER ON DECEMBER 20, 2017 DISCOVERY DISPUTE HEARING. Case No. 17-cv-00220 LHK (NC) Re: Dkt. Nos. #387 , #395 , #397 , #403 , #404 . Case No. 17-md-02773 LHK (NC)Re: Dkt. Nos. #223 , #225 , #230 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY SAMSUNG ENTITIES' ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE PROTECTIVE ORDER #243 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order granting #246 Stipulation entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Order granting #241 Stipulation (as explained in ECF 245) entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 21, 2017 Filing 246 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Wireless Advocates, LLC's Production of Data in Response to Subpoena filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Regarding Modifications to Protective Order Governing Confidential Material #233 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 243 MOTION for Protective Order Non-Party Samsung Entities' Assented-To Motion to Supplement the Protective Order filed by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Responses due by 1/4/2018. Replies due by 1/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Halling, Gary) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Montano (Montano, Michael) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 245 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Discovery Letter Briefs #395 , 396 , #397 , #404 in 17-cv-0220; #223 , #225 , #230 in 17-md-02773. Court to issue order memorializing its rulings. (FTR Time: 10:16am - 11:08am / 1:232pm - 1:02pm.) Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 241 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ("Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Deadlines for Re-Review of Privileged Documents") filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 240 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Amend the Order Appointing Interim Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph W. Cotchett, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta Kauble Pachman on behalf of Plaintiffs (Pachman, Krysta) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 238 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kalpana Srinivasan of Susman Godfrey, L.L.P. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' and Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Discovery Statement #223 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/20/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 236 *DISREGARD AND SEE CORRECTED ORDER DKT. #237 )* Modified on 12/20/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2017 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Gwendolyn R. Giblin (Giblin, Gwendolyn) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Danitz (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 233 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Modifications to Protective Order Governing Confidential Material filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pierce, Rio) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 232 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Discovery Statement #223 and Joint Discovery Letter Brief #230 . Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 231 Declaration of Asim M. Bhansali in Support of #223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' and Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Discovery Statement filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 16, 2017 Filing 230 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Apple's Document Production Status and Document Logging filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 12/16/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 229 STATUS REPORT REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 228 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Subpoena to Wireless Advocates, LLC #225 . Hearing set for 12/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 227 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ; Jury Trial Demanded byQualcomm Incorporated. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed) filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. Responses due by 12/29/2017. Replies due by 1/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 225 Discovery Letter Brief re Subpoena to Wireless Advocates, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #220 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' and Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Discovery Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rio Pierce in Opposition to Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Redacted] Plaintiffs' and Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Discovery Statement, #4 [Sealed] Plaintiffs' and Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Joint Discovery Statement, #5 Declaration of Rio Pierce in Support of Joint Discovery Statement, #6 Exhibit s 1-7 to Pierce Declaration in Support of Joint Discovery Statement [Sealed], #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jacob Siegel (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING Non-Party LGE MobileComm's Assented-To Motion to Supplement the Protective Order #219 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 220 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11953705.) filed by Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc.. (Giardina, David) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 219 MOTION for Protective Order Non-Party LGE MobileComm's Assented-To Motion to Supplement the Protective Order filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2017. Replies due by 1/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY HUAWEI DEVICE U.S.A. INC.'S ASSENTED-TO MOTION TOSUPPLEMENT PROTECTIVE ORDER #217 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 217 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc.. Responses due by 12/26/2017. Replies due by 1/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greenblatt, Nathan) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER GRANTING Non-Party ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Assented-to Motion to Supplement Protective Order #215 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 Filing 215 MOTION for Protective Order Non-Party ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Assented-to Motion to Supplement Protective Order filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. Responses due by 12/26/2017. Replies due by 1/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Non-Party ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Assented-to Motion to Supplement Protective Order)(Moore, Steven) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Moore Notice of Appearance of Steven A. Moore as Counsel for Non-Party ZTE (USA) Inc. (Moore, Steven) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER GRANTING Non-Party Kyocera International Inc.'s Assented-To-Motion to Supplement Protective Order #212 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to File Kyocera's Assented-To Motion to Supplement Protective Order filed by Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Andreuvon Euw, Christian) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY VERIZON WIRELESS'S Assented-To-Motion to Supplement Protective Order #209 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/6/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/4/2017. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 Filing 209 NOTICE by Verizon Wireless ASSENTED -TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cote, Alexander) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 208 STATUS REPORT REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 207 Letter from Kalpana Srinivasan re Response to Email from Third Party ZTE. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER RE: THIRD PARTY EMAIL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION Regarding the Disclosure of Privileged or Protective Information Produced Without Manual Review. Re: Dkt. No. #204 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 Filing 204 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #203 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (CORRECTED) filed by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 203 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Kiyoto Iwahashi (Iwahashi, Ryan) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J. Rho (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C Lo (Lo, Jason) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 27, 2017 Filing 199 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Discovery Hearing held on 11/27/2017 re ECF Nos. #193 and #198 Discovery Letter Briefs re Apple's Document Productions. 1. Counsel Bornstein and Takashima ordered to speak with each directly before filing any further ex parte discovery briefs between Apple and Qualcomm. 2. Apple and Qualcomm by 11/29 to file stipulation re FRE 502(d). 3. Qualcomm's request for further interim deadlines in Apple's document production denied for lack of good cause. 4. Court reaffirmed discovery deadlines and need to comply with them. 5. Apple's next status report due Dec 1. FTR Time: 2:12 to 2:38 (26 mins.) Attorneys for Qualcomm: Gary Bornstein and Andrew Huynh. Attorney for Apple: Ed Takashima. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/27/2017)
November 24, 2017 Filing 198 Counter Discovery Letter Brief re Apple's Document Productions filed by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING Google LLC's Assented-to Motion to Supplement Protective Order #196 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 196 MOTION Non-party Google LLC's Assented-to Motion to Supplement Protective Order filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 12/5/2017. Replies due by 12/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geyer, Christopher) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott Geyer (Geyer, Christopher) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 194 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING Re: Joint Discovery Letter Brief #193 for 11/27/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Apple to file response to letter brief by 11/24 noon. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 193 Discovery Letter Brief re Apple's Document Productions filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 192 STATUS REPORT REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by Laura Hallahan (Maxwell, K.C.) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 190 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by Janet Ackerman (Maxwell, K.C.) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 189 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 15, 2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (186 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order, (312 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK) Transcript Order, (183 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order, (187 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order, (185 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 12/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2018. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 11/16/2017)(TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 11/16/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2017 Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Intel Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Ford, Mark) (Filed on 11/16/2017)(TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 11/16/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2017 Filing 188 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Apple Inc.'s Proposed Use of Technology Assisted Review held on 11/15/2017: #287 in 17-cv-0220, #174 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK; See Attached Minute Order. Attorney for Qualcomm: Gary Bornstein. Attorney for Apple: Edward Takashima. FTR: 1:20pm - 1:36pm. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 Filing 185 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 11/15/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 11/15/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2017 Filing 184 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2017 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 Filing 183 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 11/15/2017)(TRANSCTIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 11/15/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Supplement the Protective Order filed by Sprint Spectrum L.P. #181 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 181 MOTION Non- Parties Sprint Spectrum, L.P., Boost Worldwide, Inc., and Virgin Mobile USA, L.P. Assented-to Motion to Supplement the Protective Order filed by Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Responses due by 11/28/2017. Replies due by 12/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order regarding Assented-To Motion To Supplement Protective Order)(Niegowski, David) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by David James Niegowski (Niegowski, David) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 179 STATUS REPORT REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION by Apple Inc.. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamarah P. Prevost (Prevost, Tamarah) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 177 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING Re: Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Apple Inc.'s Proposed Use of Technology Assisted Review #174 . Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 176 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 11/15/2017 further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 1/3/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in part and Denying in part #110 Motion to Dismiss.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 174 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Apple Inc.'s Proposed Use of Technology Assisted Review filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 8, 2017 Filing 173 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 172 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 11, 2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #141 Transcript Order, #159 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 11/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2018. (Related documents(s) #141 , #159 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE IN PROCURING EVIDENCE FROM FINNISH NON-PARTIES. #257 in case 5:17-cv-00220-LHK; #165 in case 5:17-md-02773-LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2017: #1 Letter of Request to the Central Authority for Finland) (lmh, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2017 Filing 170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Discovery Letter Briefs 248 , #249 , #258 , #265 , Requests for Discovery directed to Finland re Nokia #251 , #257 in 17-cv-0220 LHK and #165 in 17-md-02773 held on 11/6/2017: See Minute Order. Attorneys for Federal Trade Commission: Dan Matheson, Jennifer Milici. Attorney for MDL Plaintiffs: Mark F. Ram. Attorneys for Qualcomm: Yonatan Even, Robert Van Nest, Geoffrey Holtz. FTR: 2:10pm - 3:18pm. Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2017).
November 6, 2017 Filing 169 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike (ECF No. #110 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 11/9/17 at 2:00 PM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 11/9/17 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #166 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 167 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Consent Motions for Issuance of Letters Rogatory #165 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK, #251 #257 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 166 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11846377.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing--NY))(Stark, Richard) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 165 Consent MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Elizabeth Gillen, #2 Appendix A - Proposed Letter of Request to Nokia, #3 Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATED ORDER RE: SUBSTANTIAL COMPLETION DATE OF DOCUMENT PRODUCTION BY NON-PARTY INTEL CORPORATION. 247 in case 5:17-cv-00220 LHK, #163 in case 5:17-md-02773 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 163 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #162 Order on Discovery Letter Brief, ("[Proposed] Stipulated Order re: Substantial Completion Date of Document Production by Non-Party Intel Corporation") filed by Intel Corporation, Qualcomm Incorporated. (Ryan, Antony) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER RE: INTEL CUSTODIANS. Re: ECF #161 in 17-md-02773 LHK and Re: ECF #244 in 17-md-00220 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 161 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Intel Corporation, Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Antony L. Ryan, #2 Declaration of Mark A. Ford, #3 Declaration of Aichatou Evans, #4 Proposed Order)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #158 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/11/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/20/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 11/7/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. #160 . Further Case Management Conference continued to 11/15/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 157 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT QUALLCOMM INC.'S Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Quallcomm's Statement Concerning Search Terms and Interim Productions Deadlines #151 in case 5:17-md-2773 LHK and #151 in case 5:17-cv-0220 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Re: ECF #150 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK. Re: ECF #226 , #231 , #235 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/18/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 154 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING the Discovery Hearing set for 3:30 PM on 10/18/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 153 REPLY (re #110 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike ) filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qualcomm Incorporated re #150 Statement, (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF QUALCOMM'S STATEMENT CONCERNING SEARCH TERMS AND INTERIM PRODUCTIONS DEADLINES filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary A. Bornstein, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Statement, #4 Unredacted Statement)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 150 Statement re #142 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,, DEFENDANT QUALCOMM INCORPORATED'S DISCOVERY STATEMENT CONCERNING SEARCH TERMS AND INTERIM PRODUCTION DEADLINES by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING MODIFICATIONS TO PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL filed by MediaTek USA Inc. and MediaTek Inc. #147 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING Non-Party T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Assented-To Motion To Modify Protective Order filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. #145 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING MODIFICATIONS TO PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL filed by MediaTek USA Inc. and MediaTek Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Christopher Holtzman AS COUNSEL FOR NON-PARTIES MEDIATEK USA INC. AND MEDIATEK INC. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 145 MOTION Non-Party T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Assented-To Motion To Modify Protective Order filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Responses due by 10/30/2017. Replies due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellisen Shelton Turner (Turner, Ellisen) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alicia Hadnett (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER AFTER DISCOVERY HEARING. Re: ECF #132 , #133 , #135 , #136 in 17-md-02773 and Re: ECF #208 , #210 , #212 , #213 in 17-cv-0220. Discovery Hearing set for 10/18/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 7. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Set Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 10/18/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 12, 2017 Filing 141 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/11/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 10/12/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 10/12/2017 (lhS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2017 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Joint Discovery Letter Briefs held on 10/11/2017: #132 and #135 in 17-md-02773, #208 and #212 in 17-cv-00220; Court to issue order. Attorney for Qualcomm: Gary Bornstein. Attorney for Apple: Edward Takashima. Attorney for Class Plaintiffs: Amanda Bonn (ph). Attorney for FTC: Jennifer Milici (ph). (FTR Time: 3:07pm to 3:24pm - recording stopped with hearing ending at 3:36pm). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2017).
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #138 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 11, 2017 Filing 138 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Antony L. Ryan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11787241.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Ryan, Antony) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 10, 2017 Filing 137 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING re Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Search Terms #135 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK, #212 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Hearing set for 10/11/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 Filing 136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary A. Bornstein, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Search Terms - FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 1 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 2 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 3 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 4 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 5 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 6 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 7 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 8 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 9 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #13 Exhibit 10 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 11 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #15 Exhibit 12 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit 13 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #17 Exhibit 14 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #18 Exhibit 15 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #19 Exhibit 16 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #20 Exhibit 17 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #21 Exhibit 18 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #22 Exhibit 19 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #23 Exhibit 20 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #24 Exhibit 21 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #25 Exhibit 22 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #26 Exhibit 23 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #27 Exhibit 24 - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 Filing 135 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Search Terms filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary A. Bornstein, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 8, 2017 Filing 134 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE Joint Discovery Letter Briefs #132 in 5:17-md-02773-LHK) and #208 in 5:17-cv-00220-LHK. Hearing set for 10/11/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties may participate by telephone and must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscouts.gov to obtain the dial-in number. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2017)
October 7, 2017 Filing 133 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary A. Bornstein, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - REDACTED, #4 Exhibit 1 - NONREDACTED, #5 Exhibit 5 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 8 - REDACTED, #7 Exhibit 8 - UNREDACTED, #8 Exhibit 10 - REDACTED, #9 Exhibit 10 - UNREDACTED, #10 Exhibit 11 - REDACTED, #11 Exhibit 11 - UNREDACTED, #12 Exhibit 13 - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/7/2017)
October 7, 2017 Filing 132 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary A. Bornstein, #2 Exhibit 1 - REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 - REDACTED, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10 - REDACTED, #12 Exhibit 11 - REDACTED, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13 - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/7/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Scott Michael Dinner , Withdrawal of Scott M. Dinner as Attorney (Dinner, Scott) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 129 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #110 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #128 Stipulation Regarding Discovery Coordination.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Discovery Coordination filed by All Plaintiffs. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by Mark Cardillo, Scott Frederick, Tina Heim, Andrea Hogan, Monica Morrow, Charles Poon, Allison Shipp (Hartley, Jason) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 31, 2017 REMARK: Signed & Sealed Order & Letters Rogatory Re: Docket No. #120 hand delivered to counsel for Qualcomm on 8/31/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED REQUESTS for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Chinese Third Parties [120-1]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #(1) ORDER for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Japanese Third Parties [120-2] #(2) ORDER for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Korean Third Parties [120-3], #(3) ORDER for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Taiwanese Third Parties [120-4]). (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 29, 2017 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel R. Schlabach (Schlabach, Gabriel) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Richardson Dearborn (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Takashima (Takashima, Edward) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 28, 2017 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick Benad, Martha Countess, Karen Hood, Jaime Martin re #121 Notice (Other) Proof of Service (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 28, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE by Patrick Benad, Martha Countess, Karen Hood, Jaime Martin Notice of Change of Firm Name (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 120 MOTION for Discovery Defendant's Amended Requests for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Court's Order filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. Responses due by 9/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order)(Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CERTAIN REQUESTS FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE. Re: Dkt. Nos. #101 - #108 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Korean Non-Parties #113 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying #114 Administrative Motion to Shorten Time.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 116 Statement of Non-Opposition re #114 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Shorten Time filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 23, 2017 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/11/2017 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 22, 2017 Filing 114 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Shorten Time filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Williams, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 18, 2017 Filing 113 Consent MOTION for Discovery to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Korean Non-Parties filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/1/2017. Replies due by 9/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rajesh James, #2 Exhibit A - proposed Letter of Request to the appropriate Judicial Authority in the Republic of Korea for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., #3 Exhibit B - proposed Letter of Request to the appropriate Judicial Authority in the Republic of Korea for LG Electronics, Inc., #4 Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 112 Letter Brief ("Joint Discovery Letter Brief (Req. 45 in Qualcomm's subpoena to Apple Inc.)") filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 111 Letter Brief ("Joint Discovery Letter Brief (Reqs. 12, 17 in Qualcomm's subpoena to Apple)") filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary A. Bornstein, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/25/2017. Replies due by 9/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Rizk, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Rizk, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration of David W. Rizk re ECF technical failure)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 109 Declaration of Nitin Jindal Regarding Motions to Approve Requests for International Judicial Assistance filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 108 Declaration of Geoffrey T. Holtz in Support of #107 MOTION for Discovery to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Taiwanese Third Parties filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #107 ) (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 107 MOTION for Discovery to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Taiwanese Third Parties filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. Responses due by 8/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 106 Declaration of Geoffrey T. Holtz in Support of #105 MOTION for Discovery to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Korean Third Parties filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #105 ) (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 105 MOTION for Discovery to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Korean Third Parties filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. Responses due by 8/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 104 Declaration of Geoffrey T. Holtz in Support of #103 MOTION for Discovery to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Japanese Third Parties filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #103 ) (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 103 MOTION for Discovery to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Japanese Third Parties filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. Responses due by 8/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 102 Declaration of Geoffrey T. Holtz in Support of #101 MOTION for Discovery to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Chinese Third Parties filed byQualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #101 ) (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 101 MOTION for Discovery to Approve Request for International Judicial Assistance in Procuring Evidence from Chinese Third Parties filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. Responses due by 8/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 100 **CLERK'S NOTICE RE: PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS**Counsel is encouraged to review Rule 2.1(c) - Rules of Procedure of the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE: DISCOVERY LIMITS PURSUANT TO Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/2/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 31, 2017 Filing 98 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 25, 2017 Filing 97 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this Notice, the 7/27/17 further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 10/25/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 96 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 95 STATUS REPORT Report to Court Regarding Pending MDL Cases on File by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 11, 2017 Filing 94 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time for Non-Party InterDigital to Seek Supplemental Protective Order(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 87 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Non-Party InterDigital, Inc.'s Consented-To Motion for Extension of Time to Seek Supplemental Protective Order filed by InterDigital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Rees, #2 Proposed Order)(Rees, Maura) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Regarding Modifications To Protective Order Governing Confidential Material #72 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/25/2017 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Lindsey Carr, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #82 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Michelle Mackay. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal affecting a single individual action should be posted on the docket sheet of that action. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 84 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-25-17, before Judge Lucy H. Koy. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #38 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2017. (Related documents(s) #38 ) (las, ) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 83 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-11-17, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2017. (las, ) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Mackay (Hartley, Jason) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Rio Shaye Pierce (Pierce, Rio) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time for Non-Parties Nokia USA Inc. and Nokia Technologies Oy to Seek Supplemental Protective Order(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #70 Motion for Extension of time for Non-Party Interdigital to Seek Supplemental Protective Order.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 78 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Non-Parties Nokia USA Inc. and Nokia Technologies Oy's Consented-To Motion for Extension of Time to Seek Supplemental Protective Order filed by Nokia USA Inc., Nokia Technologies OY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Koppelman, #2 Proposed Order)(Koppelman, Ryan) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE by Craig Housenick, Ryan Margulis, Richard Rizzo NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Spector, Eugene) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. Ford ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11469730.) filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ford, Mark) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 75 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of William F. Lee ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11467087.) filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lee, William) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Timothy D. Syrett ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11467049.) filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Syrett, Timothy) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph J. Mueller ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11466952.) filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mueller, Joseph) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Draft] Stipulation Regarding Modifications To Protective Order Governing Confidential Material filed by Intel Corporation. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Daniel Selwyn For Non-Party Intel Corporation (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION Extension of Time to Seek Supplemental Protective Order Non-Party InterDigital, Inc.'s Consented-To Motion for Extension of Time to Seek Supplemental Protective Order filed by InterDigital, Inc.. Responses due by 6/27/2017. Replies due by 7/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Levin, #2 Proposed Order)(Levin, Michael) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Lea Rees Notice of Appearance of Maura L. Rees on Behalf of Non-Party InterDigital, Inc. (Rees, Maura) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brett Levin Notice of Appearance of Michael B. Levin on Behalf of Non-Party InterDigital, Inc. (Levin, Michael) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Catherine Chan (Chan, Rachael) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey T. Holtz (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Nitin Jindal (Jindal, Nitin) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan of Carel Ale (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #62 Stipulation RE: Case Schedule.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Case Schedule) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Dryer)(Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #39 Motion to Relate Case.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Barnes Dryer (Dryer, Alexander) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11432820.) filed by Beth Crandall, Rebecca Davis, Melissa Ju, Kendall Martin, Thomas McManus, Rodrigo Sapla, Kimberly Scavone, Clarissa Simon, Chris Thompson, Dalia Zatlin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dinner, Scott) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11432533.) filed by Beth Crandall, Rebecca Davis, Melissa Ju, Kendall Martin, Thomas McManus, Rodrigo Sapla, Kimberly Scavone, Clarissa Simon, Chris Thompson, Dalia Zatlin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Le, Christopher) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11432510.) filed by Beth Crandall, Rebecca Davis, Melissa Ju, Kendall Martin, Thomas McManus, Rodrigo Sapla, Kimberly Scavone, Clarissa Simon, Chris Thompson, Dalia Zatlin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Battin, Timothy) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/11/17 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Sarah Key, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 11, 2017 and May 25, 2017 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Jennifer Milici, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Milici, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/29/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11427890.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - NY)(Taffet, Richard) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11427885.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - DC)(Tom, Willard) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11427881.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - NY)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11427877.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - NY)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11427872.) filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - NY)(Peles, Nicole) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 40 Proposed Order ([Draft] Protective Order Governing Confidential Material) by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION to Relate Case filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steven N. Williams)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 11, 2017 and May 25, 2017 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Qualcomm Incorporated, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/05/2017 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Amended). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/25/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/25/17 from 1:34-2:23PM (49 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 7/27/17 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): Kalpana Srinivasan, Steven N. Williams, and Steve W. Berman. For Defendant(s): Robert A. Van Nest, Justina K. Sessions, Eugene M. Paige, and Asim M. Bhansali. 3rd Party Plaintiff : Jennifer Milici (FTC) (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings pursuant to ECF no. #36 . Further Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Class Certification Hearing set for 7/26/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Hearing on Dispositive Motions set for 2/14/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2019 01:30 PM. Jury Trial (8 day estimate) set for 4/29/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JENNIFER MILICI AS COUNSEL FOR NON-PARTY FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Milici, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/24/2017) Modified on 5/25/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2017 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sarah Key. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Appointing Interim Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel #9 #11 #12 #13 #14 .(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11388904.) filed by Beth Crandall, Rebecca Davis, Melissa Ju, Kendall Martin, Thomas McManus, Rodrigo Sapla, Kimberly Scavone, Clarissa Simon, Chris Thompson, Dalia Zatlin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Novak, Paul) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 11, 2017 Filing 28 Clerk's List of Attendance at the May 11, 2017 Hearing on Motions to Serve as Interim Class Counsel. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosanne L. Mah (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
May 9, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11378065.) filed by Lindsey Carr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - PA)(Kane, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 9, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11377580.) filed by Lindsey Carr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - PA)(Gordon, Ruthanne) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE by Jordie Bornstein, Cordt Byrne, Elliot Carter, Matthew Christianson, Jeff Ciotti, Dwight Dickerson, Logan Griesemer, Ryan Hart, William Horton, Steve Krug, Gail Margolis, Kate Mortensen, Alyssa Nee, Christopher Whalen, Stephan Farid Wozniak, Christopher Zayas-Bazan Notice of Pending Action (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stein, Samantha) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Chang (Chang, Joyce) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Francis Ram (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam John Zapala (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 16 Statement in Support of Appointment of Hausfeld LLP and Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel by Boardsports School LLC, Jordie Bornstein. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 15 Statement of Plaintiff in Support of the Appointment of Hausfeld LLP and Cotchett, Pitre, & McCarthy LLP by David Carney. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Lindsey Carr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A to Saveri Decl., #3 Declaration of Eric L. Cramer, #4 Exhibit A to Cramer Decl., #5 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion to Appoint Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Susman Godfrey LLP Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Thomas McMahon, Sarah Key. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, #3 Exhibit A to Berman Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Berman Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Berman Declaration, #6 Declaration of Kalpana D. Srinivasan, #7 Exhibit A to Srinivasan Declaration, #8 Exhibit B to Srinivasan Declaration, #9 Exhibit C to Srinivasan Declaration, #10 Exhibit D to Srinivasan Declaration, #11 Exhibit E to Srinivasan Declaration, #12 Exhibit F to Srinivasan Declaration, #13 Exhibit G to Srinivasan Declaration)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Jordie Bornstein, Cordt Byrne, Elliot Carter, Matthew Christianson, Jeff Ciotti, Dwight Dickerson, Logan Griesemer, Ryan Hart, William Horton, Steve Krug, Gail Margolis, Kate Mortensen, Alyssa Nee, Christopher Whalen, Stephan Farid Wozniak, Christopher Zayas-Bazan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney, #2 Exhibit A (Hausfeld - Firm Resume), #3 Exhibit B (Example Billing Protocol), #4 Exhibit C (Hearing Transcript))(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by John William Kiefer, III, Matthew Mitchell, Susan Gonzalez-Pender, Terese Russell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven N. Williams, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 10 Statement in Support of Appointment of Hausfeld LLP as Interim Class Counsel by Rachel L. Miller. (Burke, Christopher) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application for Appointment of Louise H. Renne of Renne Sloan Holtzman Sakai LLP as Liaison Counsel; Statement in Support of Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy LLP and Hausfeld LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Renee Acosta, Patricia Burness, Carol Harris, Robert Links, Nichelle Lyons, Nuala Vignoles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cikes, Steve) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES; finding as moot (7) Administrative Motion to Relate by Judge Lucy H. Koh. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER in 17-CV-220. Judge Nathanael Cousins shall be the discovery judge for the consumer Multi-District Litigation matter. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/19/17. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 17, 2017 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases filed by Lindsey Carr. Responses due by 4/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A to Saveri Decl., #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 17, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon M. Fauth, Jr (Fauth, Gordon) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 17, 2017 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jordie Bornstein, Cordt Byrne, Elliot Carter, Matthew Christianson, Jeff Ciotti, Dwight Dickerson, Logan Griesemer, Ryan Hart, William Horton, Steve Krug, Gail Margolis, Kate Mortensen, Alyssa Nee, Christopher Whalen, Stephan Farid Wozniak, Christopher Zayas-Bazan re #3 Order Setting Schedule For Appointment Of Interim Class Counsel And Consolidated Amended Complaint And Response; Order Continuing Case Management Conference -- (including Service to Southern District Plaintiffs) (Stein, Samantha) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 13, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Pursuant to ECF no. #3 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Hearing on motion to serve as Interim Class Counsel set for 5/11/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint set for 11/9/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Schedule for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel and Consolidated Amended Complaint and Response; Order Continuing Case Management Conference.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/13/17. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 12, 2017 Filing 2 STATUS REPORT (Joint) for the Consumer Class Cases by Jordie Bornstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stein, Samantha) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. It is Further Ordered that transfer of the action listed on Schedule B is denied. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 5:17-md-2773 has been opened and assigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. Documents relating to all actions should be filed in the master docket sheet and in the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed in the master docket sheet, and in the docket sheets for each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed in the master docket sheet and in the docket sheet of that action. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Qualcomm Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated
Represented By: Eric Brinn Hall
Represented By: Nitin Jindal
Represented By: Geoffrey T. Holtz
Represented By: Steven A. Hirsch
Represented By: Asim M. Bhansali
Represented By: Roger G. Brooks
Represented By: Daniel Scott Leventhal
Represented By: Rachael Catherine Chan
Represented By: James W Carlson
Represented By: Benjamin Hans Diessel
Represented By: Richard J. Stark
Represented By: Matan Shacham
Represented By: Talbot Richard Hansum
Represented By: Vanessa A. Lavely
Represented By: Stefan H Atkinson
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Represented By: Willard K Tom
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: Bryn Anderson Williams
Represented By: Marc Brian Collier
Represented By: Walter Scott Tester
Represented By: Gary Andrew Bornstein
Represented By: Yonatan Even
Represented By: Richard S. Taffet
Represented By: Joe Wesley Earnhardt
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Represented By: Evan R. Chesler
Represented By: Richard Stephen Zembek
Represented By: Daniel Alejandro Prati
Represented By: David W. Rizk
Represented By: Michael Brent Byars
Represented By: Alexander Barnes Dryer
Represented By: Nicole Peles
Represented By: Jesselyn K Friley
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Hucek
Represented By: Eugene Morris Paige
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Antony L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hart
Represented By: Bruce J. Wecker
Represented By: Samantha Stein
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Carel Ale
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Daniel B. Rehns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Mark Francis Ram
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Jill Michelle Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Mackay
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Represented By: Carel Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Patnode
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Carel Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Minon
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Carel Ale
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Bambini
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Carel Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Margolis
Represented By: Bruce J. Wecker
Represented By: Samantha Stein
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Carel Ale
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Daniel B. Rehns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Fuller
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Carel Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Nagy
Represented By: Bruce J. Wecker
Represented By: Samantha Stein
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Carel Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hallahan
Represented By: Carel Ale
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Countess
Represented By: Carel Ale
Represented By: Jessica Moy
Represented By: Todd Anthony Seaver
Represented By: Nyran Rose Rasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lammel
Represented By: Jeffrey Greg Lewis
Represented By: Carel Ale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Links
Represented By: Steve Cikes
Represented By: Carel Ale
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McManus
Represented By: Scott Michael Dinner
Represented By: Daniel Edward Birkhaeuser
Represented By: Timothy D. Battin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Carel Ale
Represented By: Christopher Le
Represented By: Robert M. Bramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Cruz
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Carel Ale
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Martin
Represented By: Scott Michael Dinner
Represented By: Daniel Edward Birkhaeuser
Represented By: Timothy D. Battin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Carel Ale
Represented By: Christopher Le
Represented By: Robert M. Bramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times</