Heredia v. The Hertz Corporation

Plaintiff: Ernesto Miguel Heredia
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv00870
Filed: February 9, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice for Failure to Prosecute. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/7/2018. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
July 23, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 8/3/2018. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/7/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 7/23/2018. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
June 22, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting 11 defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Amended complaint due by 7/12/2018. 6/26/2018 motion hearing vacated. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heredia v. The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Miguel Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?