Chapman v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Byron Chapman
Defendant: Gerald Brian Taylor, Veronica D. Lombardi, Gerald B. Taylor, Veronica Dawn Lombardi, Dhirajlal Panchal and Kokila Panchal
Case Number: 5:2018cv00903
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT RE MEDIATION BY OCTOBER 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/1/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 26, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 23 MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/26/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 11, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT RE MEDIATION BY SEPTEMBER 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Chapman
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Brian Taylor
Represented By: Catherine Mary Corfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica D. Lombardi
Represented By: Catherine Mary Corfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald B. Taylor
Represented By: Catherine Mary Corfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Dawn Lombardi
Represented By: Catherine Mary Corfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhirajlal Panchal
Represented By: Catherine Mary Corfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kokila Panchal
Represented By: Catherine Mary Corfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?