PUBG Corporation et al v. NetEase, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs PUBG Corporation and PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. sued Defendants NetEase, Inc. and NetEase Information Technology Corporation for copyright infringement, trade dress infringement, and unfair business competition, alleging that Defendant's Rules of Survival and Knives Out video games contain similar visual and audio elements to Plaintiff's Battlegrounds video game.

Plaintiff: PUBG Corporation and PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.
Defendant: NetEase, Inc., NetEase Information Technology Corporation and NetEase (Hong Kong) Limited
Case Number: 5:2018cv02010
Filed: April 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET #8*** REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (cc: form mailed to register). (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) Modified on 4/3/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PUBG Corporation, Other Affiliate Bluehole Studio Inc. for PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. (Baik, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by PUBG Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bluehole Studio Inc., Other Affiliate PUBG Santa Monica, Inc. for PUBG Corporation. (Baik, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Baik, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NetEase Information Technology Corporation, NetEase, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12240221.). Filed byPUBG Corporation, PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baik, Steven) (Filed on 4/2/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBG Corporation et al v. NetEase, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBG Corporation
Represented By: Steven S. Baik, Esq.
Represented By: Ketan Vinodkumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.
Represented By: Steven S. Baik, Esq.
Represented By: Ketan Vinodkumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetEase, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetEase Information Technology Corporation
Represented By: Michael Francis LaFond
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Mark Yeh-Kai Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetEase (Hong Kong) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?