City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System v. Hastings et al
Plaintiff: City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System
Defendant: Reed Hastings, David Wells, Richard Barton, A. George Battle, Timothy Haley, Jay Hoag, Leslie Kilgore, Ann Mather, Brad Smith, Anne Sweeney, Neil Hunt, Ted Sarandos, Greg Peters, David Hyman and Netflix, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv02107
Filed: April 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 48 NOMINAL DEFENDANT NETFLIX'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO KEEP UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF 46 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TOAMEND; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO PUBLICLY FILE DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/4/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 39 NOMINAL DEFENDANT NETFLIXS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS; VACATING ORDER AT 38 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/4/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING 36 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/30/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/9/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 3 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, AS MODIFIED BY 12 NOMINAL DEFENDANT NETFLIX'S NARROWED REDACTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/17/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System v. Hastings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Thomas L Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wells
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Barton
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. George Battle
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Haley
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Hoag
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Kilgore
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Mather
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Smith
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Sweeney
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Hunt
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Sarandos
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Peters
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hyman
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Lori W Will
Represented By: Ryan Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?