Rao et al v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Zixuan Rao and Kyle Barbaro
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv02813
Filed: May 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part 72 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 87 Discovery Letter Brief. Discovery Telephone Conference set for 3/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Parties shall arrange for appearances via CourtCall (866-582-6878). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 85 Discovery Letter Brief re Apple's Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rao et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zixuan Rao
Represented By: Andrew William Ferich
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Represented By: Steven Alan Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Barbaro
Represented By: Andrew William Ferich
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Represented By: Steven Alan Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Purvi Govindlal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?